Walker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Walker
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2020cv00217
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 6/18/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Brian Keith Walker. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Morrow, Stephen) Modified to add date of service and answer due date on 4/17/2020 (Bunting, M).
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/27/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
February 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Keith Walker. (Attachments: #1 Pauper forms, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Morrow, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Brian Keith Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Stephen M Morrow added to party Brian Keith Walker(pty:pla))(aty,Morrow, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Walker
Represented By: Stephen M Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?