Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Co v. Hyster-Yale Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, a/s/o Michael Melancon and Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Co
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Deep South Equipment Company and Deep South Equipment Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv00239
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Certificate of State Court Record)(aty,McDaniel, Keith)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deep South Equipment Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as this document is attached to document 6 . (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to add document number on 4/1/2020 (Bunting, M).
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc.(aty,McDaniel, Keith)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/26/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 21, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 21, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Deep South Equipment Co, Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc answer due 2/28/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 & 3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc for Hyster-Yale Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc. (aty,McDaniel, Keith)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15 JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20200004 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4190161) filed by Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc, Hyster-Yale Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party Hyster-Yale Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc(pty:dft))(aty,McDaniel, Keith) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/24/2020) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Co v. Hyster-Yale Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Materials Handling Inc
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Represented By: Denman Thomas Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Represented By: Denman Thomas Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Group Inc
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Represented By: Denman Thomas Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep South Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep South Equipment Co
Represented By: Kraig T Strenge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, a/s/o Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Co
Represented By: James T Busenlener
Represented By: Lauren Claire Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?