Harmon v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Harmon
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline L L C, Sanofi US Services, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, Pfizer Inc and Sanofi U S Services Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00320
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Southern District of Florida on 4/1/2020, assigned case number 9:20-cv-80558. (crt,Whidden, C)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 9, directing transfer to Southern District of Florida, In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2924. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-9) in MDL No.2924, IN RE: Zantac (Ranitidine) Product Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Florida upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline L L C, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi U S Services Inc (crt,Crick, S)
March 11, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline L L C, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi U S Services Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4206744) filed by Tammy Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons to Boehringer, #3 Summons to Glaxosmithkline, #4 Summons to Pfizer, #5 Summons to Sanofi)(Attorney W Paul Wilkins added to party Tammy Harmon(pty:pla))(aty,Wilkins, W) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/11/2020 to replace fillable form.) (Crick, S). Modified on 3/11/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U S Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Harmon
Represented By: Peter Eugene Ellis
Represented By: W Paul Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?