Judice et al v. TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C et al
Plaintiff: Brenda M. Judice, Christopher Judice and Brenda M Judice
Defendant: TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C and Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C
Intervenor Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut
Case Number: 6:2020cv00433
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support of Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C re #16 Order Requiring Submission on Jurisdictional Amount,, . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Brett, Taylor)
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #11 Intervenor Complaint by Christopher Judice and Brenda M Judice.(aty,Barron, John) Modified on 5/28/2020 to add filer (Dauterive, C).
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C.(Attorney Taylor Edward Brett added to party Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C(pty:intvd), Attorney Taylor Edward Brett added to party TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C(pty:intvd))(aty,Brett, Taylor)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, not later than June 3, 2020, the defendants shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts that support a finding that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. These facts should be supported with summary judgment-type evidence. The plaintiffs will be allowed seven days to respond to the defendants submission. Compliance Deadline set for 6/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/14/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 11:30 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/1/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/5/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 6/29/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/22/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/23/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/22/2021. Discovery deadline 5/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2021. Daubert Motions due by 6/21/2021. Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/20/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2021. Bench Books due by 10/5/2021. Trial Depositions due by 10/5/2021. Real Time glossary due by 10/12/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 10/12/2021. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 5/11/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2020. Following discussion, a trial date of November 29, 2021 and a pretrial date of October 19, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. were selected. A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C . (aty,Brett, Taylor)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. (aty,Martinez, John)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut.(crt,Alexander, E)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/5/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene with consent by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Complaint of Intervention)(Attorney John W Martinez added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut(pty:mov))(aty,Martinez, John) Modified on 5/5/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on May 11, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 01:00 PM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.) (crt,Guidry, C)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C identifying Corporate Parent C P G OpCo LP, Other Affiliate Columbia Energy Group, Other Affiliate Columbia Hardy Corp, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Partners L P, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Group Inc, Other Affiliate TransCanada PipeLine U S A Ltd, Other Affiliate TransCanada Pipelines Ltd, Other Affiliate T C Energy Corporation, Other Affiliate C P G OpCo GP L L C, Other Affiliate C P P GP L L C for Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C. (aty,Brett, Taylor)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C identifying Corporate Parent A N R Pipeline Co, Other Affiliate American Natural Resources Co, Other Affiliate TransCanada PipeLine U S A Ltd, Other Affiliate TransCanada Pipelines Ltd, Other Affiliate Transcanada American Investments Ltd, Other Affiliate T C Energy Corporation for TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. (aty,Brett, Taylor)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C.(aty,Brett, Taylor)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/8/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Marshall A Hevron, Taylor Edward Brett on behalf of Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/21/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C. TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C answer due 4/14/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number 201010160 F with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4228923) filed by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Sheriff's Service Information, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing)(Attorney Taylor Edward Brett added to party Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Taylor Edward Brett added to party TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Brett, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judice et al v. TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C
Represented By: Marshall A Hevron
Represented By: Taylor Edward Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C
Represented By: Marshall A Hevron
Represented By: Taylor Edward Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M. Judice
Represented By: John Peter Barron
Represented By: Donovan Jay O'Pry, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Judice
Represented By: John Peter Barron
Represented By: Donovan Jay O'Pry, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M Judice
Represented By: John Peter Barron
Represented By: Donovan Jay O'Pry, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut
Represented By: John W Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?