Dartez et al v. Mynatt et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Dartez and Desiree Dartez
Defendant: Global Freight Systems LLC, Jack Allen Brandon Mynatt, United Specialty Insurance Company, Global Freight Systems L L C and United Specialty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv00434
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Freight Systems L L C. (aty,Grubbs, Julius)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Answer to Complaint sent to Julius W Grubbs, Jr on behalf of Global Freight Systems L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/17/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Global Freight Systems L L C, Jack Allen Brandon Mynatt.(Attorney Julius W Grubbs, Jr added to party Global Freight Systems L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Julius W Grubbs, Jr added to party Jack Allen Brandon Mynatt(pty:dft))(aty,Grubbs, Julius)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Dartez. Global Freight Systems L L C served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (aty,Barry, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Unexecuted Service for Petition For Damages Unclaimed served on Jack Allen Brandon Mynatt on Unclaimed, filed by Kyle Dartez. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(aty,Barry, James) Modified on 6/1/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Grubbs, Julius)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Grubbs, Julius) Modified on 4/15/2020to indicate amended (Jones, P).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/9/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State National Companies Inc for United Specialty Insurance Company. (aty,Grubbs, Julius)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Julius W Grubbs, Jr on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/21/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin Parish, Case Number 89125; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4229132) filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 State court notice of filing, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Julius W Grubbs, Jr added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Grubbs, Julius) (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/7/2020) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dartez et al v. Mynatt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Dartez
Represented By: James Brent Barry
Represented By: Bart J Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Dartez
Represented By: James Brent Barry
Represented By: Bart J Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Freight Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Allen Brandon Mynatt
Represented By: Julius W Grubbs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Julius W Grubbs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Freight Systems L L C
Represented By: Julius W Grubbs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Julius W Grubbs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?