Stelly v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Plaintiff: Beverly Stelly
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00570
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Justin L Williams for Beverly Stelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/8/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ryan Williams for Beverly Stelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/8/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nathaniel Clark for Beverly Stelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/8/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) against Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc with Jury Demand filed by Beverly Stelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 FDA requirements for Medication Guides, #3 Exhibit 3 Wal-Mart Pharmacy Orders for patient Beverly Stelly, #4 Exhibit 4 Medication Guide for Amiodarone HCI and Cordarone)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/4/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 3, 2020 REMARK: On 06/03/2020, five motions to appear pro hac vice were filed and a fee of $105.00 was paid for each motion. Two of the motions filed were duplicate motions creating an overpayment of fees paid of $210.00. Receipt numbers ALAWDC-4281351 and ALAWDC-4281358 are duplicate payments and have been set up for refund to Lemmon Law Firm, LLC. In accordance with office policy, a holding period is required to verify settlement of funds. The refund will be processed on or about 06/15/2020. (crt,Williams, C)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Motion for Justin Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Stelly. (aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to modify docket text(Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 Motion for Ryan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Stelly. (aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Motion for Nathaniel Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Stelly. (aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to modify docket text(Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Andrew Allen Lemmon on behalf of Beverly Stelly regarding #5 MOTION for Ryan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #6 MOTION for Nathaniel Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Action taken: Motions terminated and shown as refiled at #7 MOTION for Nathaniel Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #8 MOTION for Ryan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Justin L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4281751) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order - refiled at doc 12)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to reflect proposed order refiled at doc 12 (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Ryan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4281749) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order - refiled at doc 11)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to reflect proposed order refiled at doc 11 (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Nathaniel Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4281746) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order - refiled at doc 10)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to modify docket text and reflect proposed order refiled at doc 10 (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED AT DOC 7. MOTION for Nathaniel Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4281358) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to modify docket text to reflect filed in error and resubmitted at doc 7 (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED AT DOC 8. MOTION for Ryan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4281351) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2020 to show filed in error and refiled at doc 8 (Miletello, A).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr for Beverly Stelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/15/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified on 5/15/2020 to reflect correct magistrate judge. (Alexander, E)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4263653) by Beverly Stelly. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemmon, Andrew)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc. (crt,Crick, S)
May 5, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4254883) filed by Beverly Stelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew Allen Lemmon added to party Beverly Stelly(pty:pla))(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 5/6/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stelly v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Stelly
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Represented By: Justin L Williams
Represented By: Nathaniel Joseph Clark
Represented By: Patrick Ryan Williams
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?