Tatum v. Social Security
Plaintiff: John Tatum
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv00625
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by John Tatum. U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/26/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed in error as 3 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 6/29/2020 to add document number. (Crick, S).
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4265749) filed by John Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jason Alan Weaver added to party John Tatum(pty:pla))(aty,Weaver, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tatum
Represented By: Jason Alan Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?