Lewis v. A B C Insurance Co, et al
Plaintiff: Claboryan Lewis
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy, LLC, Island Operating Company, Inc., The Speedy P, Rivertec Enterprises, LLC, A B C Insurance Co, Fieldwood Energy L L C, Rivertec Enterprises Inc, X Y Z Insurance Co, Island Operating Co Inc, Speedy P, P Q R Insurance Co and Yellow Fin Marine Services L L C
Case Number: 6:2020cv00720
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Speedy P, Yellow Fin Marine Services L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, Fieldwood Energy L L C, Island Operating Co Inc, P Q R Insurance Co, Rivertec Enterprises Inc, Speedy P, X Y Z Insurance Co, Yellow Fin Marine Services L L C with Jury Demand filed by Claboryan Lewis.(aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 7/24/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Island Operating Co Inc.(aty,Kay, Ped)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Island Operating Co Inc. (aty,Kay, Ped)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR. Counsel will file correct document. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Island Operating Co Inc.(Attorney Ped C Kay, III added to party Island Operating Co Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Kay, Ped) Modified on 7/24/2020 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fieldwood Energy L L C. (aty,Bercaw, James)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fieldwood Energy L L C.(Attorney James D Bercaw added to party Fieldwood Energy L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Bercaw, James)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rivertec Enterprises Inc. (aty,Hale, Paul)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint sent to Paul Durand Hale on behalf of Rivertec Enterprises Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/10/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rivertec Enterprises Inc.(Attorney Paul Durand Hale added to party Rivertec Enterprises Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Hale, Paul)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claboryan Lewis. Fieldwood Energy L L C served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (aty,Moroux, Jerome)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claboryan Lewis. Island Operating Co Inc served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (aty,Moroux, Jerome)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A B C Insurance Co, Fieldwood Energy L L C, Island Operating Co Inc, P Q R Insurance Co, Rivertec Enterprises Inc, Speedy P, X Y Z Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S)
June 5, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, Fieldwood Energy L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co, Rivertec Enterprises Inc, P Q R Insurance Co, Island Operating Co Inc, Speedy P. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4284701) filed by Claboryan Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jerome Harold Moroux added to party Claboryan Lewis(pty:pla))(aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 6/8/2020to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. A B C Insurance Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Operating Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Speedy P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivertec Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy L L C
Represented By: James D Bercaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivertec Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Audrey Ellen Gitz
Represented By: Michael Thomas Amy
Represented By: Paul Durand Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Operating Co Inc
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedy P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Q R Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Fin Marine Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claboryan Lewis
Represented By: Jerome Harold Moroux
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?