Island Operating Co Inc et al v. Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C et al
Plaintiff: Wood Group P S N Inc, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036 and Island Operating Co Inc
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co and Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C
Case Number: 6:2020cv00879
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2021 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/2/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/6/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 5/20/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/20/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/20/2021. Discovery deadline 6/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2021. Daubert Motions due by 7/19/2021. Motions in Limine due by 10/18/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2021. Bench Books due by 11/2/2021. Trial Depositions due by 11/2/2021. Real Time glossary due by 11/9/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 11/9/2021.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 9/11/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:00 AM by video conference before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Specific instructions for participating in the conference will be emailed to counsel closer to the settlement conference date. Each party shall deliver to Judge Whitehurst a written Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by e-mail no later than seven days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/2/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents Zurich Holding Co of America Inc, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Co. (aty,Peytavin, Michael) Modified to add corporate parents on 8/21/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Recovery of Defense Costs Pursuant to Contract by Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C, Zurich American Insurance Co.(Attorney Michael Don Peytavin added to party Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Don Peytavin added to party Zurich American Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Peytavin, Michael) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Island Operating Co Inc, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036. Zurich American Insurance Co served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (aty,Broussard, Hal)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Island Operating Co Inc, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036. Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (aty,Broussard, Hal)
July 16, 2020 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, ALAWDC-4321004, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C, Zurich American Insurance Co. For plaintiff, Wood Group P S N Inc. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified docket text on 7/15/2020 (Bunting, M).
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C, Zurich American Insurance Co. For plaintiff, Island Operating Co Inc. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified docket text on 7/15/2020 (Bunting, M).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bridgid D Ashcraft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/15/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bradley L DeLuca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/15/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Waive Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/15/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 15, 2020 RECEIVED Pro Hac Vice fee for Brigid D Ashcraft on behalf of Wood Group P S N Inc in the amount of $105, receipt number 64635008174. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to add text on 7/15/2020 (Devillier, W).
July 15, 2020 RECEIVED Pro Hac Vice fee for Bradley L DeLuca on behalf of Wood Group P S N Inc in the amount of $105, receipt number 64635008173. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to add text on 7/15/2020 (Devillier, W).
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/REQUEST for Waiver of Local Counsel Requirement by Wood Group P S N Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(crt,Taylor, L)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Brigid D Ashcraftto Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wood Group P S N Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Brigid D Ashcraft added to party Wood Group P S N Inc(pty:pla))(crt,Taylor, L)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Bradley L DeLucato Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wood Group P S N Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Bradley Lane DeLuca added to party Wood Group P S N Inc(pty:pla))(crt,Taylor, L)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036. (aty,Broussard, Hal)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Island Operating Co Inc. (aty,Broussard, Hal)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND FOR RECOVERY OF DEFENSE COSTS PURSUANT TO CONTRACT against Waukesha Pearce Industries, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number BLAWDC-4321004) filed by Island Operating Co Inc, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036, Wood Group P S N Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Attorney Hal J Broussard added to party Island Operating Co Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Broussard, Hal) Modified on 7/14/2020 to add filer (Taylor, L).
July 14, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Taylor, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Operating Co Inc et al v. Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Group P S N Inc
Represented By: Bradley Lane DeLuca
Represented By: Brigid D Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 1036
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Operating Co Inc
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael Don Peytavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukesha Pearce Industries L L C
Represented By: Michael Don Peytavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?