Broussard v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rage Renee Broussard, II
Defendant: Walmart Louisiana L L C, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Murphy Oil U S A Inc and Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish
Case Number: 6:2020cv00896
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Rage Renee Broussard, II. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/10/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent sought but not yet obtained by Rage Renee Broussard, II. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Blanda, Nicholas)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Adopt #8 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/8/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Murphy Oil U S A Inc. (aty,Kean, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION To Adopt #8 MOTION to Remand with consent by Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Chappuis, Richard) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (Dunford, T).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Exhibit 1 - Walmart Responses to Murphy Oil's Second Requests for Admission)(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #8 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 10/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Rage Renee Broussard, II. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed order)(aty,Blanda, Nicholas) Modified on 8/14/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 12, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C. (ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 (pg 149) TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER.(crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Murphy Oil U S A Inc. (ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 (pg 128) TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER.(crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C. (ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 (pg 34) TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER.(crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Murphy Oil U S A Inc. (ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 (pg 28) TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER.(Attorney Richard B Crohan added to party Murphy Oil U S A Inc(pty:dft))(crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 (pg 21) TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER.(crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C . (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East Inc, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas L P, Other Affiliate Walmart Inc, Other Affiliate WSE Management, L L C, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, L L C for Walmart Louisiana L L C; Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Property Co for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. Other Affiliates Wal-Mart de Mexico S A de C V, Seiyu Ltd (aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified on 8/3/2020 to add other affiliates (Jones, P).
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Murphy Oil U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent Murphy USA Inc. for Murphy Oil U S A Inc. (aty,Kean, Richard)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/23/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jami Lacour Ishee, Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/31/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/17/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
July 17, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish answer due 7/24/2020; Murphy Oil U S A Inc answer due 7/24/2020; Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust answer due 7/24/2020; Walmart Inc answer due 7/24/2020; Walmart Louisiana L L C answer due 7/24/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P)
July 17, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish, Murphy Oil U S A Inc, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C (ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #4 TO DOCUMENT #1 ) filed by Rage Renee Broussard, II.(crt,Jones, P)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2019-4464 D with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4325263) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State court petition, #3 State court return of service, #4 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #5 Exhibit B - First Supplemental and Amending Petition, #6 Exhibit C - Sheriff Returns for Murphy USA, #7 Exhibit D - Sheriff Returns for LCG, #8 Exhibit E - LCG's Responses to Murphy's Requests for Admission, #9 Exhibit F - Murphy USA's Consent to Removal, #10 Exhibit G - Medical Records Redacted, #11 Exhibit H - Plaintiff's Medical Recap, #12 Exhibit I - State Court Notice of Removal, #13 State Court Notice of Removal, #14 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc, Walmart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot,
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil U S A Inc
Represented By: Michael A McGlone
Represented By: Richard C Kean
Represented By: Richard B Crohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Government of Lafayette Parish
Represented By: Richard D Chappuis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rage Renee Broussard, II
Represented By: Nicholas A Blanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?