McKinney v. Biotronik Inc
Plaintiff: Belle McKinney
Defendant: Biotronik Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00898
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Belle McKinney (aty,Domingue, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/20/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/17/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Shannon Marie Jaeckel on behalf of Biotronik Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/31/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant granted a 30 day extension. (15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette, C-20202634D, filed 7/7/2020). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. Motions terminated: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Biotronik Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Biotronic, Inc. (15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette, C-20202634D, filed 7/7/2020). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/17/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Biotronik Inc answer due 7/9/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal (crt,Miletello, A)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-2634 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4325481) filed by Biotronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Shannon Marie Jaeckel added to party Biotronic, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Jaeckel, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Biotronik Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotronik Inc
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belle McKinney
Represented By: Jessica R Reaux
Represented By: Michael Anthony Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?