White Hat et al v. Landry et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Ramon Mejia, 350 New Orleans, Peter Aaslestad, Anne White Hat, Judith Larson Hernandez, Karen Savage, RISE St James and Alberta Larson Stevens
Defendant: Jeff Landry, Bo Duhe and Ronald J Theriot
Case Number: 6:2020cv00983
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2020 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #62 Re-Urged MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness, #64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case filed by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. (aty,Spees, Pamela)
September 17, 2020 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #66 MOTION for Reconsideration of #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case filed by Jeff Landry. (aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/18/2020 (Dunford, T).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #62 Re-Urged MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness. Responses due by 9/26/2020. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/10/2020. (crt,Whidden, C)
September 10, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case with consent. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case with consent by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order for Extension of Time to File Response)(aty,Spees, Pamela)
August 27, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 27, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Spees, Pamela) Modified text on 9/18/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 26, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 26, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case by Bo Duhe. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Alexis, Ralph) Modified on 8/27/2020 to modify docket text (Whidden, C).
August 21, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #62 Re-Urged MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 21, 2020 Filing 62 Re-Urged MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness by Ronald J Theriot. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McIntire, Patrick) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 8/21/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 20, 2020 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Pamela Spees)(crt,Chicola, C)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/20/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion with consent by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Reply to Response to Motion, #3 Proposed Affidavit of Pamela Spees)(crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/19/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 18, 2020 Filing 57 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat regarding #56 MOTION for Leave to File Out-of-Time Motion for Leave to File Reply with consent . (aty,Spees, Pamela)
August 17, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Out-of-Time Motion for Leave to File Reply with consent by 350 New Orleans, Katherine Aaslestad, Peter Aaslestad, Harry Joseph, Judith Larson Hernandez, Alberta Larson Stevens, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Ramon Mejia, RISE St James, Karen Savage, Anne White Hat. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint, #2 Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, #3 Proposed Affidavit of Pamela Spees, #4 Proposed order for Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Motion)(aty,Spees, Pamela) Modified on 8/18/2020 to edit text and indicate Proposed Order to Proposed Motion For Leave to File Reply submitted as document #57 (Dauterive, C).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Bo Duhe and Ronald J Theriot answer due 8/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/13/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 12, 2020 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with consent by Bo Duhe, Ronald J Theriot. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Alexis, Ralph)
August 5, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 9/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/4/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 4, 2020 Filing 51 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/4/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/4/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 31, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. #45 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 31, 2020 Filing 50 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00322. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion to Dismiss; #31 Motion to Dismiss; #32 Motion to Dismiss. The claims against Attorney General Jeff Landry are DISMISSED. The Court GRANTS the alternative motion to transfer venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/30/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice by Jeff Landry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(St. John, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Scott St. John, #2 Exhibit)(St. John, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Sharma Pokharel, Astha) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 6, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Harry J. Vorhoff as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Harry J. Vorhoff to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Vorhoff, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
March 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #43 MOTION for Harry J. Vorhoff to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 42 Notice to Counsel:Status conference set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM is canceled.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, #32 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana filed by Bo Duhe. (Alexis, Ralph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to #34 Response in Opposition to Motion, #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeff Landry. (St. John, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to #35 Response in Opposition to Motion, #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald J Theriot. (McIntire, Patrick) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending Dispositive Motions (R. Docs. 30, 21 and 32), good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The court will review this matter in 90 days. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spees, Pamela) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spees, Pamela) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Spees Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Spees, Pamela) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #32 MOTION to Dismiss , #30 MOTION to Dismiss , #31 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss, Alternatively to Transfer to the Western District of Louisiana by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Alexis, Ralph). Added MOTION to Transfer Case to on 9/17/2019 (KAH). Modified on 9/17/2019 to edit the text (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald J Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(McIntire, Patrick) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Landry Declaration, #3 Duhe Declaration, #4 Theriot Declaration, #5 St. John Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10)(St. John, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot #27 Motion to Appear Telephonically for 9.11.19 status conference. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/06/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference set 9/11/2019 is continued and reset for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Renewed Motion to Withdraw. Margaret A. Collier be removed as counsel ofrecord for Attorney General Jeff Landry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 Renewed MOTION to Withdraw . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Renewed MOTION to Withdraw by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/22/2019 to edit the text (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice #23 Motion to Withdraw, filed by Defendant, Attorney General Jeff Landry. The motion is not signed by Margaret A. Collier, the attorney sought to be withdrawn. To the extent there is a problem obtaining Ms. Collier's signature, movant shall so indicate and state what efforts were undertaken to obtain her signature in any subsequent motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
August 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Withdraw . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. Ronald J Theriot answer due 9/16/2019. Status Report due by 10/17/2019. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Joint MOTION to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Reset Deadlines and Extend Time To File Responsive Pleadings by All Plaintiffs. (Spees, Pamela) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the text (KAH). M [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Bo Duhe waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Ronald J Theriot waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. Jeff Landry waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting for good cause shown #14 Unopposed Ex Parte Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and #15 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time. Bo Duhe and Jeff Landry responsive pleadings due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 7/8/2019 (BLR). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(St. John, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Adams, Glenn) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 9-1 with 11-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corrected Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel)(Spees, Pamela) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to FileResponsive Pleadings to the original Complaint. M. Bofill Duh, in his official capacity as District Attorney for the 16th Judicial District, State of Louisiana be and is hereby granted an additional extensionof time of four (4) days; that is, up to and including July 9, 2019, within which to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings, including but not limited to pleadings asserting Rule 12 defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1961509) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Spees, Pamela) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/28/2019) (ELW). Modified on 6/28/2019 as granted by rec doc #11 (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1961509). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file motions and/or other responsive pleadings by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Alexis, Ralph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, Attorney General Jeff Landry responsive pleadings due July 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive pleadings due by 7/5/2019 as to M. Bofill Duhe. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. M. Bofill Duhe, in his official capacity as District Attorney forthe 16th Judicial District, State of Louisiana be and is hereby granted an extension of time oftwenty-one (21) days; that is, up to and including July 5, 2019, within which to file motions and/orother responsive pleadings, including but not limited to pleadings asserting Rule 12 defenses.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings by Bo Duhe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Alexis, Ralph) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/31/2019. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bo Duhe, Jeff Landry, Ronald J Theriot. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1945469.), filed by RISE St. James, Peter Aaslestad, Ramon Mejia, Anne White Hat, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Katherine Aaslestad, Karen Savage, Alberta Larson Stevens, 350 New Orleans, Theda Larson Wright, Sharon Lavigne, Judith Larson Hernandez, Harry Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Duhe Summons, #3 Attachment Landry Summons, #4 Attachment Theriot Summons)(Spees, Pamela) (Attachment 1, 2, 3 and 4 replaced on 5/22/2019 to flatten the documents) (SWE). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Hat et al v. Landry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Bucket Brigade
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Aaslestad
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Joseph
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theda Larson Wright
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lavigne
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Mejia
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 350 New Orleans
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Aaslestad
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne White Hat
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Larson Hernandez
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Savage
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RISE St James
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Larson Stevens
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Margaret Annette C Collier
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Harry James Vorhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Duhe
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J Theriot
Represented By: Patrick Bayard McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?