Robinson v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Linda Robinson
Defendant: Walmart Inc and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv01060
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/15/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/19/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/24/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/23/2021. Discovery deadline 5/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2021. Daubert Motions due by 6/22/2021. Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/20/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021. Bench Books due by 10/6/2021. Trial Depositions due by 10/6/2021. Real Time glossary due by 10/13/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 10/13/2021.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 9/24/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
September 3, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. (16th JDC, Parish of St Mary, #134,761, filed 5/26/2020). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF can found in Attachment #8 in Document #6, Response to Removal Order.(crt,Miletello, A)
September 3, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Walmart Inc answer due 5/20/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF can be found in Attachment #9 found in Document #6, Response to Removal Order. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Swift/Walmart, #2 Affidavit Deputy Clerk, #3 State court petition, #4 Interrogatories/Req for Production, #5 Louisiana Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Clerk's Fax Confirmation, #7 State court citation, #8 State court notice of filing Answer, Req for Notice of Walmart, #9 State court return of service, #10 Clerk's Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Depo, #12 Notice of Removal)(aty,Swift, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards)(aty,Swift, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/18/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John Goulding Swift on behalf of Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St Mary Parish, Case Number 134761 A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4359021) filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Answers to Inter, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit E - Medical Expense Itemization, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Walmart, Edwards, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Goulding Swift added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Swift, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Robinson
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, IV
Represented By: Andrew J Quackenbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?