Smith et al v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Sandra Smith and Junius Smith
Defendant: Walmart Inc and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv01061
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/15/2020. (crt,Nations, S)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, IT IS ORDERED that the report is found to be complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/15/2020. (crt,Nations, S)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Walmart Inc, Sandra Smith, Junius Smith. (aty,Swift, John) Modified on 10/14/2020 to add filers. (Crick, S).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 01:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/9/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/13/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/6/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 5/21/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/21/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/21/2021. Discovery deadline 6/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2021. Daubert Motions due by 7/20/2021. Motions in Limine due by 10/18/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2021. Bench Books due by 11/3/2021. Trial Depositions due by 11/3/2021. Real Time glossary due by 11/10/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 11/10/2021.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 9/18/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
September 3, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. (15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette, #20202730, filed 7/10/2020) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #8 of Document #6, Response to Removal Order.(crt,Miletello, A)
September 3, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Walmart Inc answer due 7/10/2020. (15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette, #20202730, filed 6/30/2020). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #7 of Document #6, Response to Removal Order. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John G. Swift/Walmart, #2 Affidavit Deputy Clerk, #3 State court petition, #4 Covid-19 Notifications, #5 Correspondence re LA Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State court citation, #7 State court return of service, #8 State court notice of filing Answer, #9 Notice of Removal)(aty,Swift, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards)(aty,Swift, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/18/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John Goulding Swift on behalf of Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-2730 L with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4359240) filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Req for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Req for Admissions, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Report, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit Walmart, Edwards, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Goulding Swift added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Swift, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Smith
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Craig Ray Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junius Smith
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Craig Ray Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?