American Security Insurance Co v. Trosclair et al
Plaintiff: American Security Insurance Company and American Security Insurance Co
Defendant: Melvin Trosclair, Sr., Theresa Trosclair and Melvin Trosclair, Sr
Case Number: 6:2020cv01066
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Select Umpire by Melvin Trosclair, Sr, Theresa Trosclair, by American Security Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- resume, #2 Exhibit A -- fee schedule)(aty,Serou, Gordon) Modified on 10/15/2020 to add filers (Jones, P).
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Security Insurance Co. Theresa Trosclair served on 8/19/2020, Answer due 10/18/2020. (aty,Serou, Gordon) Modified o include service date and answer due date on 9/22/2020 (Bunting, M).
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Security Insurance Co. Melvin Trosclair Sr served 8/19/2020, Answer due 10/18/2020. (aty,Serou, Gordon) Modified to include service date and answer due date on 9/22/2020 (Bunting, M).
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. and Interfinancial Inc for American Security Insurance Co. (aty,Serou, Gordon) Modified on 8/18/2020 to add affiliate (Jones, P).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melvin Trosclair, Sr, Theresa Trosclair. (crt,Jones, P)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Gordon P Serou, Jr on behalf of American Security Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Appoint Umpire against Melvin Trosclair, Sr, Theresa Trosclair (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4360039) filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Gordon P Serou, Jr added to party American Security Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Serou, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Security Insurance Co v. Trosclair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Trosclair, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Trosclair
Represented By: Joseph F LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Trosclair, Sr
Represented By: Joseph F LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?