Roman v. Anthony
Plaintiff: Junius L Roman, Jr and Junius Lee Roman, Jr
Defendant: Drapper Anthony, Loyce Anthony, Tangala Robertson and Iberia Medical Hospital
Case Number: 6:2020cv01083
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court dated 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of Claim/LETTER from Plaintiff to Court dated 9/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Plaintiff to the Court regarding his case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Thomas, T)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $5.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/11/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Junius Lee Roman, Jr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #3 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Drapper Anthony, Loyce Anthony, Tangala Robertson, Iberia Medical Hospital filed by Junius Lee Roman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Support by Junius Lee Roman, Jr re #1 Complaint. Clerk added plaintiff's DOC and facility ID numbers to docket sheet and resent doc. #3 with forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/21/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 Form, #2 IFP Form)(crt,Chicola, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Drapper Anthony filed by Junius L Roman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T). Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junius L Roman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junius Lee Roman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drapper Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyce Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tangala Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Medical Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?