Kivinen v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Sami Kaleva Kivinen
Defendant: Eric Staiger, Chad Wolf, I C E, D H S, Diana Whitte, William P Barr, Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U S Dept of Homeland Security, G E O Group Inc and Diane Whitte
Case Number: 6:2020cv01091
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT adopting #4 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Kivenens Motion for TRO 1 to prohibit his transfer from PPIPC is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 10/14/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to: La Salle ICE Processing Center, P O Box 2826, Jena, LA 71342. Clerk resent doc. 4 in 20-cv-01091 on 9/29/2020 and doc. 13 in 20-cv-870 on 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Sami Kaleva Kivinen, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center, re: #4 Report and Recommendations returned marked: return to sender, inmate not found. (crt,Haik, K)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/14/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 9/11/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 8, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Haik, K)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff submitted an IFP application not completed by an authorized Accounts Officer. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/24/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 2241 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/25/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/24/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for for Order to refrain Respondents from transferring Petitioner from ICE jurisdiction during the pendency of these proceedings by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to add document number on 8/24/2020 (Devillier, W).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J). Need certification regarding prison account.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sami Kaleva Kivinen. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Petition for Habeas, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J). Petition not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kivinen v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Staiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D H S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Whitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E O Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Whitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Kaleva Kivinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?