Carter v. C R England Inc
Plaintiff: James B Carter, Jr., John Cole, Beau Bogunovich, Jimmy Begay, James Belts, Monty Stone, Lisa Hough, James R Wing, Darrylone Shuemake, Jr, Damian Jones, Cardell Gayfield, James B Carter, Jr, Jason Must, All Plaintiffs, Brandon Wilcox, Yuri Holmes, April Tokarsky and Ray Hargrove
Defendant: C R England Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv01108
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. C R England Inc served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (aty,DeJean, Kenneth)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Martin A Shellist for All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/23/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re #18 Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members, MOTION to Expedite by James B Carter, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/22/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of M Todd Slobin for All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/22/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mark G Lazarz for All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/22/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit with opposition by James B Carter, Jr. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Arbuckle, Melinda) Modified on 10/22/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
October 21, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for M. Todd Slobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4431821) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth)
October 21, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Martin A. Shellist to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4431673) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth)
October 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Mark G. Lazarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4431457) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) (Main Document 23, Attachment 2 replaced on 10/21/2020) (Miletello, A).
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members MOTION to Expedite filed by C R England Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Hansen Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Crowl Declaration)(aty,Kennedy, John) Modified on 10/20/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 EXHIBIT P to #18 Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members, MOTION to Expedite by James B Carter, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/15/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit with consent sought but not yet obtained by James B Carter, Jr. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibit P, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Arbuckle, Melinda) Modified on 10/15/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members MOTION to Expedite in Opposition filed by James B Carter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed order)(aty,Arbuckle, Melinda)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #10 MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members MOTION to Expedite filed by C R England Inc: Responses due by 10/12/2020, Replies due by 10/19/2020. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that the Court will conduct a telephone conference with the parties on 10/26/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are to contact the Court for the conference at 877-336-1839 Access Code 2869540 #. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/5/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Drew R Hansen for C R England Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/2/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John T Kennedy for C R England Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/2/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for John T. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4408942) by C R England Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent for Electronic Notice and Service, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 10/1/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C R England Inc. (aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 10/1/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Drew R. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4408905) by C R England Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent for Electronic Notice and Service)(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 10/1/2020 to modify docket text and to indicate #13 Proposed Order submitted as a separate document (Miletello, A).
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R England Inc. (aty,Desmond, Susan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for An Order Prohibiting and Remedying Misleading Communications by Plaintiff's Counsel to Putative Class Members , MOTION to Expedite (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/1/2020.) by C R England Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Susan F Desmond added to party C R England Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 10/1/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action signed by Monty Stone by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 9/11/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action signed by Jason Must by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Collective Action Against C.R. England)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 9/3/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Melinda Arbuckle for All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/31/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ricardo J Prieto for All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/31/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Melinda Arbuckle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4371958) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Ricardo J. Prieto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4371947) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C R England Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action signed by Jimmy Begay, James Belts, Beau Bogunovich, John Cole, Cardell Gayfield, Ray Hargrove, Yuri Holmes, Lisa Hough, Damian Jones, Darrylone Shuemake Jr, April Tokarsky, Brandon Wilcox, James R Wing by James B Carter Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 8/26/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C R England Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4369430) filed by James B Carter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Collective Action Against C.R. England, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kenneth W DeJean added to party James B Carter, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,DeJean, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. C R England Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cole
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Bogunovich
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Begay
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Belts
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Stone
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hough
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Wing
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrylone Shuemake, Jr
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Jones
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardell Gayfield
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Carter, Jr
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Must
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Wilcox
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuri Holmes
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Tokarsky
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Hargrove
Represented By: Martin A Shellist
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: M Todd Slobin
Represented By: Ricardo J Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R England Inc
Represented By: Drew R Hansen
Represented By: Susan F Desmond
Represented By: John T Kennedy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?