Jackson et al v. United Financial Casualty Co et al
Plaintiff: Dudley Jackson and Sarah Jackson
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Co and Progressive Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv01183
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Financial Casualty Co.(aty,Musgrave, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Financial Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corp for United Financial Casualty Co. (aty,Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 9/16/2020 to add additional Corporate Parent Progressive Commercial Holdings Inc (Dauterive, C).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/15/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Richard Todd Musgrave on behalf of United Financial Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/28/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/14/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 11, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. United Financial Casualty Co answer due 9/18/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #3 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 11, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20202130 (Filing fee $400, receipt number BLAWDC-4385823) filed by United Financial Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Record - Removal, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party United Financial Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Musgrave, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. United Financial Casualty Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Jackson
Represented By: Archie P Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jackson
Represented By: Archie P Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Co
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Magen Whitney Detillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?