Peregrino-Guevara v. Witte et al
Petitioner: Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara
Respondent: Dianne Witte, Eric Staiger and U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 6:2020cv01200
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte re #11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex B Valentine v. Collier)(crt,Haik, K)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/22/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
October 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020.), Motions Transferred regarding #15 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Haik, K)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte regarding #12 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #3 Proposed exhibit - Ex B Valentine v. Collier)(aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified to capture motion event on 10/21/2020 (Haik, K).
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice filed by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara)(aty,Gold, Aaron)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency to Edwin Henry Byrd, IV on behalf of U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte regarding #12 of Supplemental Authority. Reason: Leave of court has not been granted for the filing of this supplemental memorandum. LR7.4 indicates "Memoranda may not be supplemented except with leave of court first obtained.". (crt,Haik, K)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 DEFICIENT NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte re #11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified to add deficiency notation on 10/20/2020 (Haik, K). Modified to remove "?" on 10/21/2020. Pleading refiled in its entirety as doc. #15 (Haik, K).
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Ladwig)(aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 10/26/2020. See doc. #17 for Notice of Supplemental Authority & Ex B Valentine v. Collier (Haik, K).
October 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Responses due by 10/13/2020 Replies due by 10/20/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION for Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/1/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Setting Briefing Schedule by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte, Eric Staiger. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Gold, Aaron) Modified to add filers on 10/1/2020 (Haik, K).
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued - USA, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copies of Certified Mailing Receipts and Delivery Confirmations)(aty,Gold, Aaron)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Aaron J Gold for Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/21/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (aty,Murray, Rose)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Henry Byrd, IV on behalf of U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Dianne Witte (Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:res), Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party Eric Staiger(pty:res), Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party Dianne Witte(pty:res)) (aty,Byrd, Edwin)
September 18, 2020 CREDIT CARD REFUND of $395.00 completed this date through Pay.gov; filing fee of $400.00 was paid 09/17/2020, receipt #ALAWDC-4390465; filing fee for habeas corpus matter is $5.00. Counsel is requested to confirm this refund on next credit card statement. (crt,Williams, C)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Dianne Witte, Eric Staiger, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (crt,Devillier, W)
September 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Devillier, W)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Aaron J. Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4390731) by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murray, Rose)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara, #3 Declaration of Aaron J. Gold, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Proposed order)(aty,Murray, Rose)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Eric Staiger, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Dianne Witte (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4390465) filed by Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara.(Attorney Rose A Murray added to party Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara(pty:pet))(aty,Murray, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peregrino-Guevara v. Witte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Javier Peregrino-Guevara
Represented By: Rose A Murray
Represented By: Aaron Joshua Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dianne Witte
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Staiger
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?