Douget v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: David Douget
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, A+ Airfreight, Inc., Phillip Richard Greenwood, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co and A+ Airfreight Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv01287
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Phillip Richard Greenwood.(aty,MacDonald, Ian)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A+ Airfreight Inc, Progressive Corporation corporate parent of Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified docket text to add corporate parent on 10/15/2020 (Bunting, M).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/6/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/5/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of A+ Airfreight, Inc., Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/19/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 2, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 2, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by A+ Airfreight Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Bunting, M)
October 2, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-3950-K with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4409635) filed by Phillip Richard Greenwood, A+ Airfreight, Inc., Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit List of Parties and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State court petition State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Responses to Request for Admission, #7 Exhibit Dr. John Sledge Record)(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party A+ Airfreight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Phillip Richard Greenwood(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,MacDonald, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douget v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Douget
Represented By: John Derek Aswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A+ Airfreight, Inc.
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Richard Greenwood
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A+ Airfreight Inc
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?