Carvajal v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Leodany Santana Carvajal
Defendant: Diane Widde, Eric Staiger, William P Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 6:2020cv01362
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/24/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 20, 2020 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Leodany Santana Carvajal in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635064864. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 1 MOTION for Order to refrain Respondents from transferring Petitioner from ICE jurisdiction during the pendency of these proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/26/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 11/23/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 In forma pauperis form)(crt,Taylor, L)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Leodany Santana Carvajal. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to refrain Respondents from transferring Petitioner from ICE jurisdiction during the pendency of these proceedings by Leodany Santana Carvajal. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified on 10/22/2020 to add document number (Dunford, T).
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leodany Santana Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Petition for Habeas, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J)
October 21, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carvajal v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Widde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Staiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodany Santana Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?