Dean et al v. Hilcorp Energy Co
Plaintiff: Roy Dion Jr, Joseph R Dean and Roy Dion, Jr
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv01401
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilcorp Energy Co. (crt,Crick, S)
November 5, 2020 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by Joseph R Dean, Roy Dion, Jr. ( Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4454951) . (aty,Braud, C)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency to C Arlen Braud, II on behalf of Joseph R Dean, Roy Dion, Jr regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: No filing fee accompanied this complaint. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 29, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilcorp Energy Co with Jury Demand (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Joseph R Dean, Roy Dion Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney C Arlen Braud, II added to party Joseph R Dean(pty:pla), Attorney C Arlen Braud, II added to party Roy Dion Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Braud, C) Modified on 10/30/2020 to indicate as deficient (Miletello, A). Modified on 11/5/2020 to remove deficient status. Fee paid 11/5/2020. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean et al v. Hilcorp Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dion Jr
Represented By: C Arlen Braud, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Dean
Represented By: C Arlen Braud, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dion, Jr
Represented By: C Arlen Braud, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?