Stewart et al v. Gruber et al
Plaintiff: Parc Gardens LLC, Glenn R Stewart, Maison Lafayette LLC, Maison Lafayette L L C doing business as Camelia Gardens L L C and Parc Gardens L L C
Defendant: Metzger Architecture, LLC, Morton M Gruber, American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company, Gruber & Associates, Architects, LLC, Thomas Metzger, American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania, Gruber & Associates Architects L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co, Metzger Architecture L L C and Continental Casualty Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv01479
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The telephone conference with the Courtroom Deputy originally set for January 21, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby RESET on January 25, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2021 10:00 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Telephone Scheduling Conference with consent by Thomas Metzger, Metzger Architecture L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Barnett-Bernal, Susan)
January 11, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Telephone Scheduling Conference with consent. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on January 12, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Removal Order by Thomas Metzger, Metzger Architecture L L C re #4 Removal Order of November 20, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15th JDC Ledger for Civil No. 2020-2168)(aty,Barnett-Bernal, Susan) Modified docket text on 12/18/2020 (Bunting, M).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Molly Gunnels for Thomas Metzger,Molly Gunnels for Metzger Architecture L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/11/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Molly J. Gunnels to Enroll as Counsel by Thomas Metzger, Metzger Architecture L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Clark, Joseph) Modified on 12/10/2020 to modify docket text(Miletello, A).
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Co. (aty,Gilbert, Ashley)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Co for American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania. (aty,Gilbert, Ashley)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gruber & Associates Architects L L C. (aty,Bergeron, Keith)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metzger Architecture L L C. (aty,Barnett-Bernal, Susan)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/20/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/19/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,sent to Catherine Nachman Thigpen, Ashley E Gilbert, Terrence L Brennan, Keith J Bergeron, Juan Jose Miranda, Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal, Joseph W Clark on behalf of American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Co, Gruber & Associates Architects L L C, Metzger Architecture L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
November 19, 2020 REFUND of $400.00 duplicate filing fee paid by credit card 11/18/2020, Rec#ALAWDC-4473780, has been completed through Pay.gov this date; attorney is requested to confirm this refund on next credit card statement (crt,Williams, C)
November 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thomas Metzger, Metzger Architecture L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF CAN BE FOUND AS ATTACHMENT #1 TO DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
November 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by Morton M Gruber, Gruber & Associates Architects L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF CAN BE FOUND AS ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
November 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
November 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF CAN BE FOUND AS ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-2168 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number BLAWDC-4473780) filed by Thomas Metzger, Metzger Architecture L L C, Morton M Gruber, Gruber & Associates Architects L L C, Continental Casualty Co, American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I State Court Record, #2 Exhibit II SOS Filings for Parc Gardens LLC, #3 Exhibit III SOS Filings for Maison Lafayette LLC, #4 Exhibit IV Affidavit of Death & Heirship of Charles Stewart, #5 Exhibit V Interrogatories & Request for Admissions, #6 Exhibit VI State Court Written Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal added to party Thomas Metzger(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal added to party Metzger Architecture, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Barnett-Bernal, Susan) Modified on 11/19/2020 to add filers and edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Gruber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metzger Architecture, LLC
Represented By: Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton M Gruber
Represented By: Keith J Bergeron
Represented By: Juan Jose Miranda
Represented By: Terrence L Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruber & Associates, Architects, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Metzger
Represented By: Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal
Represented By: Joseph W Clark
Represented By: Molly Gunnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Co of Reading Pennsylvania
Represented By: Catherine Nachman Thigpen
Represented By: Ashley E Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruber & Associates Architects L L C
Represented By: Keith J Bergeron
Represented By: Juan Jose Miranda
Represented By: Terrence L Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metzger Architecture L L C
Represented By: Joseph W Clark
Represented By: Molly Gunnels
Represented By: Susan Brooke Barnett-Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Co
Represented By: Catherine Nachman Thigpen
Represented By: Ashley E Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parc Gardens LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn R Stewart
Represented By: Timothy K Reynolds
Represented By: John Haas Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maison Lafayette LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maison Lafayette L L C doing business as Camelia Gardens L L C
Represented By: Timothy K Reynolds
Represented By: John Haas Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parc Gardens L L C
Represented By: Timothy K Reynolds
Represented By: John Haas Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?