Devillier v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sandy Huval Devillier
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 6:2020cv01631
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sandy Huval Devillier. Andrew M Saul served on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/29/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lemoine, Peter)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Chicola, C)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/17/2020. (jud,Whitehurst, Carol)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandy Huval Devillier. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Sandy Huval Devillier. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Peter J Lemoine added to party Sandy Huval Devillier(pty:pla))(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
December 15, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devillier v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Huval Devillier
Represented By: Peter J Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?