St. Landry Parish et al v. Union Oil Company of California et al
Plaintiff: Village of Cankton and Parish of St Landry
Defendant: Union Oil Co of California, Chevron U S A Inc, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Margone L L C, ConocoPhillips Co, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Zurich American Insurance Co, Ramco Inc, Steadfast Insurance Co, Grigsby Petroleum Inc, A I G Property Casualty Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Earl Moran, Bourque Vaccum Services Inc and Great Southern Oil & Gas Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Village of Cankton, Parish of St Landry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - LEQA Notice Letter)(crt,Chicola, C)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/8/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Village of Cankton, Parish of St Landry. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order granting motion for leave, #2 Proposed Pleading - Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed exhibit 7 - LEQA Notice Letter)(aty,Roche, Elizabeth) Modified docket text on 3/5/2021 (Bunting, M).
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Margone L L C, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Union Oil Co of California. (aty,Fox, Jonathan)
February 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Remand . CORRECTIVE ENTRY to properly reflect hearing Judge as Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 4/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #15 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 4/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified Judge on 2/22/2021 (Bunting, M).
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Village of Cankton, Parish of St Landry. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Notice Response Letter, #3 Exhibit State Court Judgments, #4 Exhibit Margone v. Addison Resources Petitions, #5 Exhibit 1997 Correspondence from Earl Moran, #6 Exhibit 1997 Correspondence from Ian Webster to Earl Moran, #7 Exhibit 1990 Mobil Interoffice Memo with Attachments)(aty,Roche, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Margone L L C, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Union Oil Co of California . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(aty,Fox, Jonathan)
February 5, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. A I G Property Casualty Co answer due 1/15/2021; Bourque Vaccum Services Inc answer due 1/15/2021; Chevron U S A Inc answer due 1/15/2021; ConocoPhillips Co answer due 1/15/2021; Exxon Mobil Corp answer due 1/15/2021; Great Southern Oil & Gas Co answer due 1/15/2021; Grigsby Petroleum Inc answer due 1/15/2021; Lexington Insurance Co answer due 1/15/2021; Margone L L C answer due 1/15/2021; Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc answer due 1/15/2021; Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc answer due 1/15/2021; Earl Moran answer due 1/15/2021; Ramco Inc answer due 1/15/2021; Steadfast Insurance Co answer due 1/15/2021; Union Oil Co of California answer due 1/15/2021; Zurich American Insurance Co answer due 1/15/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of these documents are attached to #14 RESPONSE to Removal Order, attachment 6. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Oil Co of California identifying Corporate Parent Unocal Corp, Corporate Parent Chevron Corp for Union Oil Co of California. (aty,Grossman, Louis)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Margone L L C. (aty,Jarrell, Charles)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corp, Corporate Parent Mobil Corporation for Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc. (aty,Fox, Jonathan)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay pending the ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/15/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Reeves, T)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst for all further proceedings Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/14/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Not Related to Remand by Margone L L C, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Union Oil Co of California, Parish of St Landry and Village of Cankton. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fox, Jonathan) Modified filers on 1/13/2021 (Bunting, M).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/13/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 1/12/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/11/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jonathan J Fox on behalf of Margone L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/25/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jonathan J Fox on behalf of Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Union Oil Co of California. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/25/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 8, 2021 Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 8, 2021 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against A I G Property Casualty Co, Bourque Vaccum Services Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, ConocoPhillips Co, Exxon Mobil Corp, Great Southern Oil & Gas Co, Grigsby Petroleum Inc, Lexington Insurance Co, Margone L L C, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Earl Moran, Ramco Inc, Steadfast Insurance Co, Union Oil Co of California, Zurich American Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Village of Cankton, Parish of St Landry. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of this document is found attached to #1 Notice of Removal, attachment #2.(filed in the 27th JDC, Parish of St Landry 9/24/2020) (crt,Bunting, M)
January 8, 2021 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against A I G Property Casualty Co, Bourque Vaccum Services Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, ConocoPhillips Co, Exxon Mobil Corp, Great Southern Oil & Gas Co, Grigsby Petroleum Inc, Lexington Insurance Co, Margone L L C, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Earl Moran, Ramco Inc, Steadfast Insurance Co, Union Oil Co of California, Zurich American Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Village of Cankton, Parish of St Landry. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of this document is found attached to 1 Notice of Removal, attachment #2.(filed in the 27th JDC, Parish of St Landry 12/3/2020)(crt,Bunting, M)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 20C3458B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4527540) filed by Margone L L C, Union Oil Co of California, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - All State Court Process, Pleadings, and Orders, #3 Exhibit B - Chevron, ExxonMobil, and Conoco Consents, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit W1, #26 Exhibit W2, #27 Exhibit W3, #28 Exhibit W4, #29 Exhibit W5, #30 Exhibit W6, #31 Exhibit W7, #32 Exhibit W8, #33 Exhibit W9, #34 Exhibit W10, #35 Exhibit W11, #36 Exhibit W12, #37 Exhibit W13, #38 Exhibit W14, #39 Exhibit W15, #40 Exhibit W16, #41 Exhibit W17, #42 Exhibit W18, #43 Exhibit W19, #44 Exhibit W20, #45 Exhibit W21, #46 Exhibit W22, #47 Exhibit W23, #48 Exhibit W24, #49 Exhibit W25, #50 Exhibit W26, #51 Exhibit W27, #52 Exhibit W28, #53 Exhibit W29, #54 Exhibit W30, #55 Exhibit W31, #56 Exhibit W32, #57 Exhibit W33, #58 Exhibit W34, #59 Exhibit W35, #60 Exhibit W36, #61 Exhibit W37, #62 Exhibit W38, #63 Exhibit W39, #64 Exhibit W40, #65 Exhibit W41, #66 Exhibit W42, #67 Exhibit W43, #68 Exhibit W44, #69 Exhibit W45, #70 Exhibit W46, #71 Exhibit W47, #72 Exhibit W48)(Attorney Jonathan J Fox added to party Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan J Fox added to party Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Fox, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Landry Parish et al v. Union Oil Company of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Co of California
Represented By: Jonathan J Fox
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Exploration & Producing North America Inc
Represented By: Jonathan J Fox
Represented By: James Edward Lapeze
Represented By: Aubrey Denton Landry
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp
Represented By: Jonathan J Fox
Represented By: James Edward Lapeze
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Holdings Inc
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margone L L C
Represented By: Jonathan J Fox
Represented By: Charles M Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Co
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc
Represented By: Jonathan J Fox
Represented By: James Edward Lapeze
Represented By: Aubrey Denton Landry
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grigsby Petroleum Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A I G Property Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bourque Vaccum Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Southern Oil & Gas Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Cankton
Represented By: William W Goodell, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Roche
Represented By: Mildred E Methvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parish of St Landry
Represented By: William W Goodell, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Roche
Represented By: Mildred E Methvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?