Jenna Marketing L L C v. Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C et al
Plaintiff: Jenna Marketing L L C
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C
Case Number: 6:2021cv00456
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 6:20-cv-1424 with Member Case Number(s): 6:21-cv-0456. Order also docketed in member case as Document #27). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/29/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 29, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 6:20-cv-01424-JDC-PJH. (crt,Jones, P)
March 25, 2021 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 6:20-cv-01424 by Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C, Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Reynaud, Claude) Modified on 3/25/2021 to add filer (Jones, P).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nathan Daniel Meyer for Jenna Marketing L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/19/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/19/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/18/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 18, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Nathan D. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4610836) by Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Mathews, Kellen)
March 18, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Larry C. Russ to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4610823) by Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Mathews, Kellen)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jennifer E Michel for Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 3/11/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jenna Marketing L L C. (aty,Mathews, Kellen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Jennifer E. Michel to Enroll as Counsel by Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Reynaud, Claude)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Kellen James Mathews,Mark R Beebe,Grant J Guillot,Taylor Michelle LeDuff for Jenna Marketing L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/11/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Claude Favrot Reynaud, III for Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. Attorney Jonesh G Daryanani and Jill Louise Ripke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 10, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Kellen J. Mathews, Mark R. Beebe, Grant J. Guillot, and Taylor M. LeDuff to Enroll as Counsel by Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kellen James Mathews added to party Jenna Marketing L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Mathews, Kellen)
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney Claude F. Reynaud, III in place of Jonesh G. Daryanani and Jill Louise Ripke with consent by Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Claude Favrot Reynaud, III added to party Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Reynaud, Claude)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/26/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/25/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Nathan Daniel Meyer, Larry Craig Russ on behalf of Jenna Marketing L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/11/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
February 24, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-10514. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Judge James V. Selna granting in part and denying in part #15 MOTION to Dismiss: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion to transfer to the District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, DENIES the motion to dismiss, and renders moot the request for an extension of time. (see document for further details) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 19 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 11:30 am is vacated. The Court will issue the trial and scheduling dates once the Motion to Dismiss or Transfer #15 has been ruled on. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumann, Timothy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to the first-to-file rule #15 filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanne Cullen)(Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to the first-to-file rule #15 filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry C. Russ, #2 Declaration of Harry Markowitz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Meyer, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to the first-to-file rule filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanne Cullen, #2 Proposed Order) (Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 2/22/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/16/2021. (lb) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Louise Ripke counsel for Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. Adding Jill L Ripke as counsel of record for Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (Attorney Jill Louise Ripke added to party Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Ripke, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC identifying Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC is a limited liability company as Corporate Parent. (Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC answer now due 1/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC.(Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonesh G Daryanani counsel for Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. Adding Jon Daryanani as counsel of record for Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (Attorney Jonesh G Daryanani added to party Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC, upon Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Felsher, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meyer, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC, (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29061839 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Larry C Russ added to party Jenna Marketing, LLC(pty:pla))(Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenna Marketing L L C v. Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C
Represented By: Jonesh G Daryanani
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Claude Favrot Reynaud, III
Represented By: Jennifer E Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Marketing L L C
Represented By: Larry Craig Russ
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Meyer
Represented By: Taylor Michelle LeDuff
Represented By: Grant J Guillot
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?