Schlosser et al v. Progressive Property Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Thad Schlosser and Sharen Schlosser
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp and Progressive Property Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 6:2021cv00627
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss defendant, American Strategic Insurance Corp without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/5/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss American Strategic Insurance Corp without prejudice by Sharen Schlosser, Thad Schlosser. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pitre, Madison) Modified text on 5/4/2021 (Dunford, T).
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jason P Foote on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Opt Out. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/28/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Opt Out of Streamlined Settlement Process of Case Management Order No. 1 with Incorporated Memorandum by Progressive Property Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Foote, Jason) Modified docket text on 4/27/2021 (Bunting, M).
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Jason P Foote on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Property Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp. for Progressive Property Insurance Co. (aty,Foote, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Property Insurance Co.(Attorney Jason P Foote added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Jason P Foote added to party Progressive Property Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Foote, Jason)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thad Schlosser, Sharen Schlosser. American Strategic Insurance Corp served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (aty,Pitre, Madison)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Property Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
March 10, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 10, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 2:21-cv-00627 from Lake Charles Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:21-cv-00627. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Property Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4602553) filed by Thad Schlosser, Sharen Schlosser. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Madison Carroll Pitre added to party Sharen Schlosser(pty:pla), Attorney Madison Carroll Pitre added to party Thad Schlosser(pty:pla))(aty,Pitre, Madison) Modified docket text on 3/10/2021 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlosser et al v. Progressive Property Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thad Schlosser
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Madison Carroll Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharen Schlosser
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Madison Carroll Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Paul William Pritchett
Represented By: James Devin Caboni-Quinn
Represented By: Jason P Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Property Insurance Co
Represented By: Paul William Pritchett
Represented By: James Devin Caboni-Quinn
Represented By: Jason P Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?