Wilson v. Landry et al
Plaintiff: Nelva Wilson
Defendant: All-State Credit Plan L L C, Landry Law Firm, Christian B Landry and Daniel M Landry, III
Case Number: 6:2021cv01224
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER consolidating Lead Case 6:21-cv-1619 with case #6:21-cv-1224. (This Order is filed as document #8 in Lead Case 6:21-cv-1619). Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 6/30/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Patrice Jones, Deputy Clerk to Nelva Wilson regarding #5 MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Daniel M Landry, III, Christian B Landry, Landry Law Firm, All-State Credit Plan L L C filed by Nelva Wilson. (crt,Jones, P)
June 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst no longer assigned to case. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Daniel M Landry, III, Christian B Landry, Landry Law Firm, All-State Credit Plan L L C by Nelva Wilson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Jones, P)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Hearing by Nelva Wilson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Jones, P)
June 17, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Jones, P)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal to United States District Court by Nelva Wilson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Jones, P)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All-State Credit Plan L L C, Christian B Landry, Daniel M Landry, III, Landry Law Firm. (crt,Jones, P)
May 5, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Nelva Wilson in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 64635008560. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 5, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All-State Credit Plan L L C, Christian B Landry, Daniel M Landry, III, Landry Law Firm with Jury Demand filed by Nelva Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Sealed Exhibit)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Landry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-State Credit Plan L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landry Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian B Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M Landry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelva Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?