Yusuf v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Mohamud Abdi Yusuf
Defendant: Merrick B Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tae D Johnson and Eric Staiger
Case Number: 6:2021cv02210
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mohamud Abdi Yusuf. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 30, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Mohamud Abdi Yusuf in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 64635008664. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/27/2021) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 2241 Form)(crt,Chicola, C)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/27/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Refrain Respondents from transferring Petitioner from ICE jurisdiction during the pendency of these proceedings by Mohamud Abdi Yusuf. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/27/2021. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 7/27/2021 (Devillier, W).
July 27, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yusuf v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamud Abdi Yusuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Staiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?