Sterling Resources Corp et al v. Welfont Group L L C et al
Plaintiff: Sterling Resources Corp and Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr
Defendant: Welfront Group L L C, Tax Appraisal Group L L C, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Shawn Marcell, Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Lynda Scull and Welfont Group L L C
Case Number: 6:2021cv02517
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 DUPLICATE FILING - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition and First Supplemental Petition served on The Welfont Group, Andrew J. Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors, LLC and Tax Appraisal Group, LLC on 08/24/2021, filed by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp. (aty,Kallam, Robert) Modified to reflect duplicate filing on 10/6/2021 (Bunting, M). See #8 .
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Original Complaint and First Amended Complaint served on The Welfont Group, LLC, Andrew J. Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors, Tax Appraisal Group L L C filed by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp. The Welfont Group L L C served 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/201; Andrew J Bryant served on 8/28/2021, answer due 9/18/2021; Bryant Asset Advisors served 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; and Tax Appraisal Group L L C served 8/28/2021, answer due 9/18/2021.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Kallam, Robert) Modified to add service dates and answer due dates on 9/20/2021 (Bunting, M).
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Welfont Group L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Lynda Scull, Tax Appraisal Group L L C, Welfront Group L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 20, 2021 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Lynda Scull, Tax Appraisal Group L L C, Welfront Group L L C, requested by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp. (aty,Kallam, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Lynda Scull, Tax Appraisal Group L L C, Welfront Group L L C with Jury Demand filed by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp.(aty,Kallam, Robert) Modified docket text on 8/20/2021 (Bunting, M).
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp. (aty,Kallam, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Shawn Marcell, Lynda Scull, Tax Appraisal Group L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Robert M Kallam on behalf of Sterling Resources Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 16, 2021 Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst added. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Andrew Bryant, Christopher Bryant, Bryant Asset Advisors L L C, Shawn Marcell, Lynda Scull, Tax Appraisal Group L L C, Welfront Group L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4778159) filed by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Resources Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Robert M Kallam added to party Arthur C LeBlanc Jr. (pty:selreq), Attorney Robert M Kallam added to party Sterling Resources Corp(pty:selreq))(aty,Kallam, Robert) Modified docket text on 8/18/2021 (Bunting, M). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/18/2021) (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling Resources Corp et al v. Welfont Group L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Resources Corp
Represented By: Robert M Kallam
Represented By: Brian Joseph Lindsey
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: William H L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr
Represented By: Robert M Kallam
Represented By: Brian Joseph Lindsey
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: William H L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welfront Group L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Appraisal Group L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Asset Advisors L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Marcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Scull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welfont Group L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?