Alvarez Barron et al v. Sterling Sugars Sales Corp
Plaintiff: Artemio Alvarez Barron, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Miguel Martinez Villalobos, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Alfredo Valdez Rodriquez, Felipe de Jesus Suarez Palafox, Julio Santiago Villegas Sifuentes, Pedro Abel Jimenez Gonzalez, Jesus Ivan Ramirez Fernandez and Jesus Pedro Zazueta Ochoa
Defendant: Sterling Sugars Sales Corporation and Sterling Sugars Sales Corp
Case Number: 6:2021cv03741
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join Suit Forms Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Artemio Alvarez Barron, Pedro Abel Jimenez Gonzalez, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Ivan Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Alfredo Valdez Rodriquez, Felipe de Jesus Suarez Palafox, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez, Julio Santiago Villegas Sifuentes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Jesus Pedro Zazueta Ochoa)(aty,Huang, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Sugars Sales Corp identifying Corporate Parent, Sterling Sugars L L C for Sterling Sugars Sales Corp. (aty,Davis, Brandon) Modified on 11/23/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez of Filing of Consent to Join Suit Forms Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Jesus Ivan Ramirez Fernandez)(aty,Huang, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez of Filing of Consent to Join Suit Forms Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Alfredo Valdez Rodriguez, #2 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Felipe de Jesus Suarez Palafox, #3 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Julio Santiago Villegas Sifuentes, #4 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join Suit for Pedro Abel Jimenez Gonzalez)(aty,Huang, David)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Valenzuela Chavez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez. Sterling Sugars Sales Corp served on 11/4/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (aty,Huang, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sterling Sugars Sales Corp answer due 12/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/10/2021. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Brandon E Davis on behalf of Sterling Sugars Sales Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Sterling Sugars Sales Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Brandon E Davis added to party Sterling Sugars Sales Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Davis, Brandon)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David Huang for Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, and Daniel Valenzuela Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/25/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Caitlin Irene Berberich for Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, and Daniel Valenzuela Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/25/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sterling Sugars Sales Corp. (crt,Crick, S)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Caitlin Berberich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4868426) by Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Davis, Daniel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/22/2021) (Crick, S). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2021) (Crick, S).
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for David Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4868392) by Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Daniel Valenzuela Chavez. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Davis, Daniel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/22/2021) (Crick, S). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2021) (Crick, S).
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sterling Sugars Sales Corp (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4868107) filed by Daniel Valenzuela Chavez, Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez, Artemio Alvarez Barron, Miguel Martinez Villalobos, Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2018 H-2A App & Clearance Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2019 H-2A App & Clearance Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2020 H-2A App & Clearance Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - FLSA Consent Forms)(Attorney Daniel Brian Davis added to party Artemio Alvarez Barron(pty:pla), Miguel Martinez Villalobos(pty:pla), Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana(pty:pla), Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez(pty:pla), Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez(pty:pla), Daniel Valenzuela Chavez(pty:pla))(aty,Davis, Daniel) Modified on 10/22/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 22, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez Barron et al v. Sterling Sugars Sales Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemio Alvarez Barron
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ernesto Pereyra Vidana
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Martinez Villalobos
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lamberto Ramirez Lopez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alfredo Ramirez Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Valenzuela Chavez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Martinez Martinez Villalobos
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Valdez Rodriquez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe de Jesus Suarez Palafox
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Santiago Villegas Sifuentes
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Abel Jimenez Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ivan Ramirez Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Pedro Zazueta Ochoa
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Caitlin Irene Berberich
Represented By: David Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Sugars Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Sugars Sales Corp
Represented By: Brandon E Davis
Represented By: Clerc Higgins Cooper
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Poucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?