Halterman v. National Railroad Passenger Corp et al
Plaintiff: David Halterman
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, C & T Dirt Works, LLP, Chad M. Boutte, Kristi Delahoussaye, National Railroad Passenger Corp, B N S F Railway Co, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, C & T Dirt Works L L P, Chad M Boutte, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co and Crum & Foster Specialty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv03776
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
2 Judge: David C Joseph
3 Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Continue trial and pretrial conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2023 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Counsel will join the teleconference by dialing 888-684-8852 and entering access code 5910394. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 11/18/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 15, 2022 Filing 32 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crum & Foster Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 15, 2022 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial with consent by B N S F Railway Co, National Railroad Passenger Corp, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, David Halterman, Kristi Delahoussaye, C & T Dirt Works L L P, Chad M Boutte. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Gideon, Kyle) Modified to add filers on 11/15/2022 (Chavis, J).
November 11, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Chad Stelly (aty,Stelly, William)
November 11, 2022 Filing 29 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Crum and Foster Specialty Insurance Company, submitted by David Halterman. (aty,Stelly, William) (Main Document 29 replaced on 11/15/2022) (Chavis, J).
November 10, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by B N S F Railway Co, National Railroad Passenger Corp.(aty,Gideon, Kyle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 21, 2022 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against B N S F Railway Co, Chad M Boutte, C & T Dirt Works L L P, Kristi Delahoussaye, Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co, National Railroad Passenger Corp, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by David Halterman.(crt,Chavis, J)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 10/21/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 20, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint with consent by David Halterman. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading First Supplemental and Amended Complaint)(aty,Stelly, William) Modified to properly capture motion event and add docket entry relationship on 10/21/2022 (Chavis, J).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/7/2022. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/30/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline dates for Plaintiff to join additional defendants and identify any appropriate liability experts be and same are hereby extended for thirty days beyond Amtrak's production of video(s) taken by the locomotive mounted cameras leading up to and at the time of the collision, with production of reports from any testifying liability experts retained by Plaintiff within fifteen (15) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/30/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
August 29, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by B N S F Railway Co, National Railroad Passenger Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2022. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) Modified to reflect brief included within pdf of main document on 8/29/2022 (Chavis, J).
August 29, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Join Additional Parties and to Designate Liability Experts (Joint Motion) with consent by David Halterman. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Stelly, William)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C & T Dirt Works L L P. (aty,Mitchell, Allen)
March 2, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co naming Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Corp as corporate parents. (aty,Mitchell, Allen) Modified on 3/2/2022 to add corporate parents (Jones, P).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/29/2022. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/29/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/26/2022. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/26/2022. Discovery deadline 11/25/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2022. Daubert Motions due by 11/25/2022. Motions in Limine due by 2/8/2023. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/24/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2023. Trial Depositions due by 2/16/2023. Bench Books due by 3/6/2023. Real Time glossary due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 2/24/2022. (crt,Roaix, G) (Main Document 16 replaced on 2/25/2022) (Roaix, G).
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #11 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Allen J Mitchell, II on behalf of C & T Dirt Works L L P, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 23, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2022. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER:- IT IS ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2022 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Counsel will join the teleconference by dialing 888-684-8852 and entering access code 5910394. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/23/2022. (crt,Schutz, E)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/10/2022. (crt,Schutz, E)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Answer to Complaint sent to Allen J Mitchell, II on behalf of C & T Dirt Works L L P and Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/23/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Chad M Boutte, C & T Dirt Works L L P, Kristi Delahoussaye, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(Attorney Allen J Mitchell, II added to party Chad M Boutte(pty:dft), Attorney Allen J Mitchell, II added to party C & T Dirt Works L L P(pty:dft), Attorney Allen J Mitchell, II added to party Kristi Delahoussaye(pty:dft), Attorney Allen J Mitchell, II added to party Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Mitchell, Allen)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge David C Joseph. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/1/2022. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B N S F Railway Co. (aty,Gideon, Kyle)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint sent to Kyle L Gideon on behalf of B N S F Railway Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2022. (crt,Reeves, T)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by B N S F Railway Co.(Attorney Kyle L Gideon added to party B N S F Railway Co(pty:dft))(aty,Gideon, Kyle)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corp naming Amtrak, Passenger Railroad Insurance Ltd, America Premier Underwiters Inc, American Financial Group Inc, Burlington Northern & Santa Fe L L C, Berkshire Hathaway, Canadian Pacific Railway as corporate parents. (aty,Gideon, Kyle) Modified on 11/22/2021 to add corporate parents (Jones, P).
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #3 Answer to Complaint, sent to Kyle L Gideon on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corp.(Attorney Kyle L Gideon added to party National Railroad Passenger Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Gideon, Kyle)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to B N S F Railway Co, Chad M Boutte, C & T Dirt Works L L P, Kristi Delahoussaye, National Railroad Passenger Corp, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. (crt,Jones, P)
October 26, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jones, P)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4872720) filed by David Halterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney William Chad Stelly added to party David Halterman(pty:pla))(aty,Stelly, William)
October 26, 2021 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by David Halterman. (aty,Stelly, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halterman v. National Railroad Passenger Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Halterman
Represented By: William Chad Stelly
Represented By: Blake G Arata, Jr
Represented By: C Perrin Rome, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & T Dirt Works, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M. Boutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Delahoussaye
Represented By: Allen J Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp
Represented By: Kyle L Gideon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B N S F Railway Co
Represented By: Kyle L Gideon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Represented By: Allen J Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & T Dirt Works L L P
Represented By: Allen J Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M Boutte
Represented By: Allen J Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Foster Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?