Moses et al v. Geico Casualty Co et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Matthew Moses, Lisette C Moses and Matthew Moses
Defendant: Geico Casualty Co and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv04060
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 15th Judicial District Court for Lafayette Parish. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Motion to Remand is GRANTED. The Court hereby REMANDS to the 15th Judicial District Court for the Parish of Lafayette, State of Louisiana, Docket No. C-2021-3991, all matters appearing under the caption above. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/20/2022. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Lisette C Moses, Matthew Moses. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Angelle, Randy)
January 19, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Crick, S)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: James J Young IV, Guidry Ranson et al, P O Box 1910, Gretna, LA 70054-1910, re: #4 Removal Order returned marked: Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Action taken: Re-noticed to updated address. (crt,Crick, S)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: James J Young IV, Guidry Ranson et al, P O Box 1910, Gretna, LA 70054-1910, re: #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary, #6 Notice of Deficiency returned marked: Return to Sender, Not at this Address. Action taken: Address modified and re-noticed to new address. (crt,Crick, S)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Geico Casualty Co. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/21/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Order filed by Geico Casualty Co regarding #5 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal) . (aty,Barry, Stephen)
December 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency to Stephen R Barry on behalf of Geico Casualty Co regarding #5 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal). Reason: Proposed order is not on separate page. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal) by Geico Casualty Co, Lisette C Moses, Matthew Moses. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021. (aty,Barry, Stephen) Modified on 12/17/2021 to indicate deficient status and add filers. (Crick, S). Modified on 12/20/2021 to remove deficient status and indicate #7 Proposed order submitted.(Crick, S).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/29/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/24/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geico Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parents, Geico Corp, Berkshire Hathaway for Geico Casualty Co. (aty,Barry, Stephen) Modified on 11/24/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th Judicial District Court, Case Number 20213991 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4906558) filed by Geico Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Listing of Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit Listing of Attorneys & Parties, #6 Exhibit Verification, #7 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Attorney Stephen R Barry added to party Geico Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Barry, Stephen) Modified on 11/24/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 24, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Geico Casualty Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to reflect jury demand contained in the #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
November 24, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Geico Casualty Co answer due 12/1/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
November 24, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses et al v. Geico Casualty Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Matthew Moses
Represented By: Randy Paul Angelle
Represented By: Christi R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisette C Moses
Represented By: Christi R Hemphill
Represented By: Randy Paul Angelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Moses
Represented By: Randy Paul Angelle
Represented By: Christi R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Co
Represented By: James J Young, IV
Represented By: John Caire Wegmann
Represented By: Stephen R Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?