Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C v. Cutera Inc
Plaintiff: Advanced Anti-Aging Center, LLC and Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C
Defendant: Cutera Inc
Case Number: 6:2022cv00890
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case, 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 6/9/2022 Replies due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 11, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 13 Motion to Dismiss with consent by Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Duck, Kevin) Modified on 5/11/2022 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case. Responses due by 5/11/2022, Replies due by 5/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/3/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Oppose 13 Motion to Dismiss with consent by Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Duck, Kevin) Modified on 5/3/2022 to create docket entry relationship and modify motion event. (Crick, S).
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cutera Inc identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Cutera Inc. (aty,Dini, Andrea)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: 13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case, 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 6/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Cutera Inc regarding #10 Answer to Complaint . (aty,Dini, Andrea) Modified on 4/13/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 13, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum/Brief re 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cutera Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Dini, Andrea) Modified on 4/13/2022 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, MOTION to Transfer Venue by Cutera Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture additional motion events. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 4/13/2022 to add document number. (Crick, S).
April 13, 2022 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Andrea Madison Dini on behalf of Cutera Inc regarding #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case. Action taken: Terminated #8 Motion to Dismiss. 13 Motion to Dismiss resubmitted. (crt,Crick, S)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY: The #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Cutera Inc is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/12/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrea Madison Dini on behalf of Cutera Inc regarding #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Case, #9 Memorandum in Support and #10 Answer to Complaint. Reason: For attorneys admitted pro hac vice, signature or endorsement of local counsel is required. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cutera Inc.(aty,Dini, Andrea) Modified on 4/12/2022 to reflect deficient (Miletello, A). Modified on 5/6/2022 to reflect corrected and resubmitted at doc #15 (Miletello, A).
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 DEFICIENT. MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by Cutera Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Dini, Andrea) Modified on 4/12/2022 to create docket entry relationship and to indicate deficient (Miletello, A). Modified on 5/6/2022 to indicate corrected at document #14 (Miletello, A).
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 DEFICIENT. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by Cutera Inc. (aty,Dini, Andrea). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case, captured more accurate motion event, modified docket text and to indicate deficient on 4/12/2022 (Miletello, A). Modified on 4/13/2022 to indicate 13 Motion to Dismiss resubmitted. (Crick, S).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrea Madison Dini for Cutera Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/6/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/5/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Good Standing - Dini, Andrea Madison filed by Cutera Inc regarding #2 MOTION for Andrea Madison Dini to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5055391) . (aty,Layrisson, Margaret)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/4/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Margaret Lalande Layrisson on behalf of Cutera, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/18/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Andrea Madison Dini to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5055391) by Cutera, Inc.. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Expired Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Layrisson, Margaret) Modified on 4/5/2022 to indicate #8 Active Certificate of Good Standing submitted. (Crick, S).
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20220852 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5055225) filed by Cutera Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Margaret Lalande Layrisson added to party Cutera, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Layrisson, Margaret) (Attachment 2 replaced with non-fillable form on 4/4/2022) (Crick, S).
April 4, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C v. Cutera Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Anti-Aging Center, LLC
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Anti-Aging Center L L C
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutera Inc
Represented By: Margaret Lalande Layrisson
Represented By: Andrea Madison Dini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?