Sam et al v. Bayou Holdco Inc et al
Plaintiff: Asa Alexander Sam and Tashana Racheal Jones
Defendant: Bayou Holdco, Inc., Bayou Wasco Insulation, LLC, TBC Industries, LLC, Advantage Resources Group, LLC, Staffmark Investment, LLC dba Advantage Resources, The Williams Companies, Inc., Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Company, LLC, Land Coast Insulation, Inc., Global Industrial Solutions, LLC, ABC Barge Company, XYZ Stevedore Services, Inc., T B C Industries L L C, Bayou Holdco Inc, Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C, Bayou Companies L L C, Advantage Resources Group L L C, Staffmark Investment L L C doing business as Advantage Resources, Williams Companies Inc, Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C, Land Coast Insulation Inc, Global Industrial Solutions L L C, A B C Barge Co and X Y Z Stevedore Services Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2022cv05208
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Staffmark Investment L L C.(aty,Brennan, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C . (aty,Vermeulen, Zoe)
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Co. (aty,Simmons, Jennifer)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C identifying Corporate Parents Williams Field Services Group L L C, Williams Companies Inc for Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C. (aty,Gaudet, Rachael) Modified docket text on 9/22/2022 (Miletello, A).
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, and Original Petition by Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C.(aty,Vermeulen, Zoe)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 9/13/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/12/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Zoe Wilde Vermeulen on behalf of Williams Companies Inc, Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED for the First Supplemental and Amended Complaint as to Advantage Resources Group L L C, Global Industrial Solutions L L C, Land Coast Insulation Inc, T B C Industries L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 127-130. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED for the Complaint by Louisiana Long Arm Statute as to Williams Companies Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 103 of 130. (crt,Mitchell, P) Modified on 9/12/2022 to show what pleading this related. (Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed for the Complaint. T B C Industries L L C answer due 9/14/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 67 of 130. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint by Global Industrial Solutions L L C, Land Coast Insulation Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 55 of 130.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by Bayou Holdco Inc, Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 94 of 130.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bayou Holdco Inc, Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 83 of 130.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against A B C Barge Co, Advantage Resources Group L L C, Bayou Holdco Inc, Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C, Global Industrial Solutions L L C, Land Coast Insulation Inc, Staffmark Investment L L C, T B C Industries L L C, Williams Companies Inc, Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C, X Y Z Stevedore Services Inc filed by Tashana Racheal Jones, Asa Alexander Sam. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 110 of 130.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed for Complaint. Advantage Resources Group L L C answer due 9/14/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. #2 , page 45 of 130. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, Revised Exhibit A by Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C. (aty,Vermeulen, Zoe)
September 7, 2022 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Zurich American Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image in this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. no. #1 and Doc. No. #2 , page 29 of 130. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 7, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 7, 2022 CONSENTS TO REMOVAL by Advantage Resources Group L L C, Bayou Holdco Inc, Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C, Global Industrial Solutions L L C, Land Coast Insulation Inc, Staffmark Investment L L C, Williams Companies Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF images can be found in Attachments 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 and 8 to Document No. #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC Iberia Parish, Case Number 138842 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5264398) filed by Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Zoe Wilde Vermeulen added to party Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Company, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Vermeulen, Zoe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam et al v. Bayou Holdco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asa Alexander Sam
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Charles W Montz, Jr
Represented By: Mary K Cryar
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashana Racheal Jones
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Charles W Montz, Jr
Represented By: Mary K Cryar
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Holdco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Wasco Insulation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Resources Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffmark Investment, LLC dba Advantage Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Company, LLC
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Coast Insulation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Industrial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Barge Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Stevedore Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T B C Industries L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Holdco Inc
Represented By: Bradley Jason Schwab
Represented By: Kenneth H Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Wasco Insulation L L C
Represented By: Bradley Jason Schwab
Represented By: Kenneth H Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Companies L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Resources Group L L C
Represented By: Jason Rhett Bonnet
Represented By: Jeffrey C Brennan
Represented By: Taylor Mark Bacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffmark Investment L L C doing business as Advantage Resources
Represented By: Jeffrey C Brennan
Represented By: Jason Rhett Bonnet
Represented By: Taylor Mark Bacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Companies Inc
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: Bradley J Schlotterer
Represented By: Rachael Ferrante Gaudet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Field Services Gulf Coast Co L L C
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: Bradley J Schlotterer
Represented By: Rachael Ferrante Gaudet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Coast Insulation Inc
Represented By: Melissa Ann Miller
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Tweedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Industrial Solutions L L C
Represented By: Melissa Ann Miller
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Tweedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Barge Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Stevedore Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Jennifer L Simmons
Represented By: Dominic Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?