Knott et al v. United Water System Inc et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Knott, Michael Carruth, Karen Carruth, Christina Sonnier and CHRISTINE OLIVIER
Defendant: United Water System Inc, American Alternative Insurance Co and American Alternative Insurance Corp
Case Number: 6:2023cv00401
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER A Scheduling Conference is set for June 6, 2023 at 2:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26(f) report into the record on or before June 1, 2023. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/5/2023. (crt,Blanke, S)
May 5, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2023 02:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 21, 2023 Filing 15 Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Water System Inc.(aty,Baay, John)
April 20, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by American Alternative Insurance Corp.(aty,Arnold, Nicholas) Modified filer on 4/20/2023 (Bunting, M).
April 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency to Nicholas Paul Arnold on behalf of American Alternative Insurance Co regarding #11 Answer to Complaint. Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 20, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Alternative Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re America Corp, Corporate Parent Munich-American Holding Corp, Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Co for American Alternative Insurance Co. (aty,Arnold, Nicholas)
April 20, 2023 Filing 11 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - ANSWER to Complaint by American Alternative Insurance Co.(aty,Arnold, Nicholas) Modified to reflect deficient status on 4/20/2023 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 4/20/2023 (Bunting, M). See #14 .
April 13, 2023 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re 9 Response to Removal Order by United Water System Inc. (aty,Singleton, AsheLee)
April 13, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by United Water System Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - NO PDF ATTACHED. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to add document number on 4/13/2023 (Bunting, M).
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Water System Inc. (aty,Singleton, AsheLee)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent . United Water System Inc is granted an extension to file responsive pleadings until 4/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/6/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
April 4, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by United Water System Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Singleton, AsheLee)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/3/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 30, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Consent to Removal by Nicholas Paul Arnold on behalf of American Alternative Insurance Co, indicating Consent (Attorney Nicholas Paul Arnold added to party American Alternative Insurance Co(pty:dft)) (aty,Arnold, Nicholas)
March 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John E W Baay, II on behalf of United Water System Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/13/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
March 30, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/30/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
March 29, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. AMERICAN ALTERNATIVE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 4/5/2023; UNITED WATER SYSTEM, INC answer due 4/5/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
March 29, 2023 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:23-cv-0401 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:23-cv-0401. (crt,Crick, S)
March 29, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin, Case Number 92514 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5507898) filed by UNITED WATER SYSTEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit C- 60-day Notice Letter, #4 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney John E W Baay, II added to party UNITED WATER SYSTEM, INC(pty:dft))(aty,Baay, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knott et al v. United Water System Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Knott
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Soileau
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Natalie Marie DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carruth
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Soileau
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Natalie Marie DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Carruth
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Soileau
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Natalie Marie DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Sonnier
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Natalie Marie DeJean
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Soileau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE OLIVIER
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Adam Russell Credeur
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Soileau
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Natalie Marie DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Water System Inc
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Represented By: John Michael DiGiglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Co
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Arnold
Represented By: Bette Matheny
Represented By: Hailey Elise Lyonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corp
Represented By: Bette Matheny
Represented By: Hailey Elise Lyonnais
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?