Lewis v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Barone Lewis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2023cv00741
Filed: June 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant Brief due by 9/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript)(aty,Brown, Shannon) Modified to indicate manual attachment received on 8/2/2023 (Williams, K).
August 2, 2023 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Shannon Thornhill Brown on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security regarding #5 Answer to Complaint. Pursuant to LR 5.7.01, the electronic version of this manual attachment is considered the original. (crt,Williams, K)
June 5, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/5/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
June 5, 2023 SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barone Lewis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cloos, Edward)
June 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Barone Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Edward J Cloos, III added to party Barone Lewis(pty:pla))(aty,Cloos, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barone Lewis
Represented By: Edward J Cloos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Shannon Thornhill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?