Heinen et al v. RiceTec Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Keith Heinen, Thomas and Cassedy Farms, John Joseph Carbalan, Blane Frey and Thomas & Cassedy Farms
Defendant: Adama Ltd, RiceTec, Inc, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, RiceTec Inc and Syngenta Seeds L L C
Case Number: 6:2023cv00873
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. RiceTec Inc answer due 9/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/24/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Diana Cole Surprenant on behalf of Syngenta Seeds L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Charles B Wilmore on behalf of RiceTec Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Charles B Wilmore on behalf of RiceTec Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by RiceTec Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Charles B Wilmore added to party RiceTec Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Wilmore, Charles)
August 14, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Keith Heinen, Blane Frey, John Joseph Carbalan, Thomas & Cassedy Farms. RiceTec Inc served on 7/27/2023, answer due 8/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Returned Green Receipt)(aty,Barry, Stephen)
August 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Keith Heinen, Blane Frey, John Joseph Carbalan, Thomas & Cassedy Farms. Syngenta Seeds L L C served on 7/27/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Returned Green Receipt)(aty,Barry, Stephen)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Syngenta Seeds L L C answer due 9/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/14/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 11, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Syngenta Seeds L L C identifying Corporate Parent Syngenta A G, Corporate Parent Syngenta Crop Protection A G, Corporate Parent Syngenta Corporation for Syngenta Seeds L L C. (aty,Surprenant, Diana)
August 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Syngenta Seeds L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Diana Cole Surprenant added to party Syngenta Seeds L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Surprenant, Diana)
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Plaintiffs & Defendants by John Joseph Carbalan, Blane Frey, Robert Keith Heinen, Thomas & Cassedy Farms. (aty,Barry, Stephen) Modified docket text on 8/11/2023 (Miletello, A).
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Stephen R Barry on behalf of John Joseph Carbalan, Blane Frey, Robert Keith Heinen, Thomas & Cassedy Farms. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 7/14/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adama Ltd, RiceTec Inc, Syngenta Seeds L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 29, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RiceTec Inc, Syngenta Seeds L L C, Adama Ltd with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5608825) filed by Robert Keith Heinen. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Stephen R Barry added to party Robert Keith Heinen(pty:pla))(aty,Barry, Stephen) Modified on 6/30/2023 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinen et al v. RiceTec Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adama Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiceTec, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiceTec Inc
Represented By: Charles B Wilmore
Represented By: Cecilia Grace Vazquez
Represented By: James A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds L L C
Represented By: Charles A Cerise, Jr
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Jeffrey M Surprenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Keith Heinen
Represented By: Stephen R Barry
Represented By: Brett Anthony Stefanski
Represented By: Scott A Stefanski
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas and Cassedy Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Carbalan
Represented By: Stephen R Barry
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Represented By: Brett Anthony Stefanski
Represented By: Scott A Stefanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blane Frey
Represented By: Brett Anthony Stefanski
Represented By: Stephen R Barry
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Represented By: Scott A Stefanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas & Cassedy Farms
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Represented By: Brett Anthony Stefanski
Represented By: Stephen R Barry
Represented By: Scott A Stefanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?