Kovach et al v. L H C Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Kovach, Amy Adkins and L H C Group 401(k) Plan
Defendant: L H C Group Inc, L H C Group 401(k) Committee, Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Chris Gill, Kimberly Seymour and Does
Case Number: 6:2023cv01041
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 9/29/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Allison A. Jones to Enroll as Counsel by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Allison Anne Jones added to party Amy Adkins(pty:pla), Attorney Allison Anne Jones added to party Glenda Kovach(pty:pla), Attorney Allison Anne Jones added to party L H C Group 401(k) Plan(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Allison)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/8/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/4/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00051. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' #22 MOTION to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and denying as moot Defendants' #25 MOTION to Stay; further directing the Clerk of this Court to transfer this action to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/4/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED and ELECTRONICALLY TRANSMITTED to the Western District of Louisiana pursuant to the #33 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Lindsey H. Chopin on behalf of Chris Gill, Marcus Macip, Kimberly Seymour, LHC Group, Inc., LHC Group 401(k) Committee, Does 1 through 10, Josh Proffitt. Local counsel: Eric W. Iskra. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8412988. (Iskra, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Stacey C.S. Cerrone on behalf of Chris Gill, Marcus Macip, Kimberly Seymour, LHC Group, Inc., LHC Group 401(k) Committee, Does 1 through 10, Josh Proffitt. Local counsel: Eric W. Iskra. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8412973. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/26/2023 to replace image) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #31 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY. Error: The signature page contained an incorrect attorney signature. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour to #28 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/25/2023 to remove link #22 and #25 motions) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour to #27 Memorandum In Opposition. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/25/2023 to remove link to #22 motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach, LHC Group 401(k) Plan in opposition to #25 MOTION by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendants' #22 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach, LHC Group 401(k) Plan in opposition to #22 MOTION by Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour, Does 1 through 10 to Transfer Venue from USDC Southern District of WV to USDC Western District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christina A. Humphrey, #2 Affidavit of Plaintiff Amy Adkins, #3 Affidavit of Plaintiff Glenda Kovach)(Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour in support of Defendants' #25 MOTION to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Iskra, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendants' #22 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/4/2023 to add link to #22 motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant LHC Group, Inc. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/4/2023 to replace image) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Does 1 through 10, Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour in support of Defendants' #22 MOTION to Transfer Venue from USDC Southern District of WV to USDC Western District of Louisiana. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 4/4/2023 to detach exhibits and file as attachments to the #22 motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour, Does 1 through 10 to Transfer Venue from USDC Southern District of WV to USDC Western District of Louisiana. (Iskra, Eric)(Additional attachments added on 4/4/2023: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (mkw). (Modified on 4/4/2023 to add party filer and to add exhibits that were inadvertently attached to the memorandum) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #22 MOTION. Error: Exhibits were attached to the #23 memorandum. Correction: Detached exhibits from the memorandum and attached to the motion. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Error: The image was not flattened. Correction: Replaced unflattened image with flattened image. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Josh Proffitt, re: #1 Complaint. Josh Proffitt served via U.S. Mail and via E-mail on Josh Proffitt's counsel Adam R. Carlisle, Lindsey H. Chopin, Stacey C. S. Cerrone of Jackson Lewis who indicated that they were authorized to accept service on behalf of Josh Proffitt on 3/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 3/8/2023 to add link to #1 complaint and to add the name of the persons served) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Kimberly Seymour, re: #1 Complaint. Kimberly Seymour served via U.S. Mail and via E-mail on Kimberly Seymour's counsel Adam R. Carlisle, Lindsey H. Chopin, Stacey C. S. Cerrone of Jackson Lewis who indicated that they were authorized to accept service on behalf of Kimberly Seymour on 3/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 3/8/2023 to add link to #1 complaint and to add the name of the persons served) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Marcus Macip, re: #1 Complaint. Marcus Macip served via U.S. Mail and via E-mail on Marcus Macip's counsel Adam R. Carlisle, Lindsey H. Chopin, Stacey C. S. Cerrone of Jackson Lewis who indicated that they were authorized to accept service on behalf of Marcus Macip on 3/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 3/8/2023 to add link to #1 complaint and to add the names of the persons served) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Chris Gill, re: #1 Complaint. Chris Gill served via U.S. Mail and via E-mail on Chris Gill's counsel Adam R. Carlisle, Lindsey H. Chopin, Stacey C. S. Cerrone of Jackson Lewis who indicated that they were authorized to accept service on behalf of Chris Gill on 3/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 3/8/3023 to add link to #1 complaint and to add the names of the persons served) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #13 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment; directing that the default be set aside as to LHC Group, Inc., and LHC Group 401(k) Committee. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/6/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (cla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #11 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to LHC Group, 401(k) Committee on 3/3/2023. (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #11 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to LHC Group, Inc. on 3/3/2023. (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour to Set Aside the #11 Default Judgment. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 3/3/2023 to add link to #11 entry of default) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour, Glenda Kovach, Amy Adkins, Chris Gill; the parties agreed to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Class Action Complaint to 4/4/2023. (Iskra, Eric) (Modified on 3/3/2023 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order RESET DEADLINE: Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt and Kimberly Seymour answer due 4/4/2023. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SET ASIDE PURSUANT TO THE #16 ORDER. ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt as to LHC Group, Inc., #2 certified mail receipt as to LHC Group, 401(k) Committee) (cc: counsel of record; defendant via certified mail) (jsa) (Modified on 3/6/2023 to note that the entry of default by clerk is set aside pursuant to the #16 order) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendants LHC Group, Inc. and LHC Group 401(K) Committee; further directing counsel for Plaintiffs to file the appropriate motions and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/1/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Personal Service for LHC Group 401(k) Committee. LHC Group 401(k) Committee served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. Summons served on Kayla Fisher. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 2/10/2023 to add the name of the person served and to correct the answer due date) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Personal Service for LHC Group, Inc. LHC Group, Inc. served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. Summons served on Kayla Fisher. (Starcher, Kenneth) (Modified on 2/10/2023 to add the name of the person served and to correct the answer due date) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order RESET DEADLINES: LHC Group 401(k) Committee and LHC Group, Inc. answer due 2/24/2023. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Renee P. Ortega on behalf of LHC Group 401(k) Plan, Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach. Local counsel: Kenneth R. Starcher. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8349594. (Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James A. Clark on behalf of LHC Group 401(k) Plan, Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach. Local counsel: Kenneth R. Starcher. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8349592. (Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Robert N. Fisher on behalf of LHC Group 401(k) Plan, Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach. Local counsel: Kenneth R. Starcher. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8349590. (Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Christina A. Humphrey on behalf of LHC Group 401(k) Plan, Amy Adkins, Glenda Kovach. Local counsel: Kenneth R. Starcher. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8349588. (Starcher, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Gill, LHC Group 401(k) Committee, LHC Group, Inc., Marcus Macip, Josh Proffitt, Kimberly Seymour, re: #1 Class Action Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to LHC Group 401(k) Committee, #2 summons as to Marcus Macip, #3 summons as to Josh Profitt, #4 summons as to Chris Gill, #5 summons as to Kimberly Seymour) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8348326. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to LHC Group, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons as to LHC Group 401(k) Committee, #3 Proposed Summons as to Marcus Macip, #4 Proposed Summons as to Josh Profitt, #5 Proposed Summons as to Chris Gill, #6 Proposed Summons as to Kimberly Seymour, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/4/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovach et al v. L H C Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Kovach
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: Christina A Humphrey
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Adkins
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Represented By: Christina A Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L H C Group 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: Christina A Humphrey
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L H C Group Inc
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L H C Group 401(k) Committee
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Macip
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Proffitt
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gill
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Seymour
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C.S. Cerrone
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Stacey C S Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?