Bank of America N A v. Wampler et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America N A
Defendant: Mary Jean Wampler and Suzanne Wills
Case Number: 6:2023cv01448
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay and orders this case shall be stayed fora period of 120 days from the date this order is signed. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/4/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case for 120 Days by Bank of America N A, Suzanne Wills, Mary Jean Wampler. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Chaney, Mark) Modified on 11/30/2023 to add filers (Miletello, A).
November 30, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case for 120 Days. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Mary Jean Wampler answer due 11/30/2023; Suzanne Wills answer due 11/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/13/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mary Jean Wampler, Suzanne Wills. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Jonathan Ashley Moore added to party Mary Jean Wampler(pty:dft))(aty,Moore, Jonathan) Modified on 11/9/2023 to add filer (Miletello, A).
November 2, 2023 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Mark James Chaney, III on behalf of Bank of America N A regarding #12 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Set answer due date of 11/20/2023 and modified docket text to indicate answer due date. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 2, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Suzanne Wills on 10/29/2023, filed by Bank of America N A. Suzanne Wills answer due date 11/20/2023 (aty,Chaney, Mark) Modified on 11/3/2023 to indicate answer due date (Miletello, A).
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kyle C Steingreaber for Bank of America N A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/23/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Evan A Moeller for Bank of America N A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/23/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 20, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition served on Mary Jean Wampler on 10/19/2023, filed by Bank of America N A. Mary Jean Wampler answer due date 11/9/2023. (aty,Chaney, Mark) Modified on 10/20/2023 to indicate answer due date (Miletello, A).
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Bank of America N A re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 20, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Bank of America N A re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 20, 2023 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Mark James Chaney, III on behalf of Bank of America N A regarding #9 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Set answer due date of 11/9/2023 and modified docket text to indicate answer due date. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Kyle C. Steingreaber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5731591) by Bank of America N A. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Evan A. Moeller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5731587) by Bank of America N A. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Jean Wampler, Suzanne Wills. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 12, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A.. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5723144) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mark James Chaney, III added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:pla))(aty,Chaney, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America N A v. Wampler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N A
Represented By: Mark James Chaney, III
Represented By: Kyle C Steingreaber
Represented By: Evan A Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jean Wampler
Represented By: Jonathan Ashley Moore
Represented By: Justin T Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Wills
Represented By: Jonathan Ashley Moore
Represented By: Justin T Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?