Special Quality Alloys Inc v. Coastal Machine & Supply Inc
Plaintiff: Special Quality Alloys Inc
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase Bank
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Coastal Machine & Supply Inc
Case Number: 6:2023cv01606
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Terry A Doughty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Special Quality Alloys Inc. (aty,Schoenhuber, Manuel)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber for Special Quality Alloys Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 12/7/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Luke J Gilman for Special Quality Alloys Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 12/7/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Luke J. Gilman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5784925) by Special Quality Alloys Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Order)(aty,Davis, Michael)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Manuel P. Schoenhuber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5784906) by Special Quality Alloys Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Order)(aty,Davis, Michael)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Davis on behalf of Special Quality Alloys Inc (Attorney Michael R Davis added to party Special Quality Alloys Inc(pty:pla)) (aty,Davis, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 11/29/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #34 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jeremy Lee Simmons on behalf of J P Morgan Chase Bank. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2023. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #34 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber on behalf of Special Quality Alloys Inc. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2023. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coastal Machine & Supply Inc. (aty,Hughes, John) Modified docket text to accurately describe pleading on 11/28/2023 (Chavis, J).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL RESUBMITTED - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coastal Machine & Supply Inc identifying Corporate Parent Coastal Machine & Supply Inc for Coastal Machine & Supply Inc. (aty,Hughes, John) Modified to reflect filed in error, correct doc filed as doc #39 on 11/28/2023 (Chavis, J).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coastal Machine & Supply Inc. (aty,Hughes, John)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John H Hughes, Jeremy Lee Simmons, Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber on behalf of Coastal Machine & Supply Inc, J P Morgan Chase Bank, Special Quality Alloys Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 11/24/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John H Hughes, Jeremy Lee Simmons, Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber on behalf of Coastal Machine & Supply Inc, J P Morgan Chase Bank, Special Quality Alloys Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/24/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #22 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of In Personam Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-04258. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to USDC for the Western District of Louisiana (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(AndyGould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Interdistrict transfer to USDC for the Western District of Louisiana. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 11/9/2023, filed. (AndyGould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant, filed by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc. (Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison on August 2, 2023. Status Conference held. Defendant may file a reply in support of Dkt. #22 Motion to Dismiss by 8/11/23. Appearances: Michael Drab for Plaintiff, Joseph Boustany and John Hughes for Defendant. (ERO: yes), filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 03:00 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of In Personam Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Special Quality Alloys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Proposed Order)(Schoenhuber, Manuel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM Under Court Rule 6(B) re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of In Personam Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Special Quality Alloys, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Drab, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(AndyGould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, filed.(RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Simmons, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Tomsen and Jeremy Simmons on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, filed. (Simmons, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of In Personam Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023, filed.(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(HortenciaLerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request for Issuance of Summons as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, filed.(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank filed by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc filed by Special Quality Alloys, Inc..(Schoenhuber, Manuel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 3 days. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2023. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/31/2023. Pltf Expert Report due by 7/31/2023. Deft Expert Witness List due by 9/1/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 9/1/2023. Discovery due by 10/31/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/17/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/1/2023. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2023. Docket Call set for 12/8/2023 at 03:00 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (VanesaAranda, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Plaintiff re: Jurisdiction, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison on May 25, 2023. Status Conference held. Judge Edison briefly described his procedures. Agreed docket control order to be entered. Judge Edison granted Deft leave to file Third-party complaint. Appearances: Michael Drab for Plaintiff, John Hughes for Defendants. (ERO: yes), filed.(RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Drab on behalf of Special Quality Alloys, Inc., filed. (Drab, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference reset for 5/25/2023 at 08:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Status Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 09:30 AM is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Docket Control Order, filed.(Schoenhuber, Manuel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 09:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Initial Conference set for 5/17/2023 at 09:00 AM is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (RubenCastro, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO TRANSFER. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the docket of United States Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison to conduct all further proceedings, including final judgment. Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. The scheduling conference set for May 17, 2023 is cancelled. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Special Quality Alloys, Inc., filed.(Schoenhuber, Manuel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay for Sixty Days. (The Initial Conference is reset for 5/17/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison)(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc, filed.(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Special Quality Alloys, Inc., filed.(Schoenhuber, Manuel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th JDC Harris County, case number 2022-72729 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29178862) filed by Coastal Machine & Supply, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hughes, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/9/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Special Quality Alloys Inc v. Coastal Machine & Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Quality Alloys Inc
Represented By: Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber
Represented By: Luke J Gilman
Represented By: Michael R Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Coastal Machine & Supply Inc
Represented By: John H Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?