Williams, Jr v. Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams, Jr
Defendant: Jerry C Montgomery, Trophy Trucking Services L L C, Higginbotham Insurance Agency Inc and Third Coast Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2023cv01687
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Answer to Amended Complaint sent to Lea Ann Smith on behalf of Jerry C Montgomery. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jerry C Montgomery.(Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party Jerry C Montgomery(pty:dft))(aty,Smith, Lea)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Williams, Jr. (aty,Bruchhaus, David)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trophy Trucking Services L L C. (aty,Smith, Lea)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 12/1/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Lea Ann Smith, David P Bruchhaus on behalf of Trophy Trucking Services L L C, Christopher Williams, Jr. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 12/14/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Lea Ann Smith on behalf of Trophy Trucking Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/14/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Higginbotham Insurance Agency Inc answer due 12/6/2023; Jerry C Montgomery answer due 12/6/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2023 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING PETITION against Jerry C Montgomery, Trophy Trucking Services L L C, Third Coast Insurance Co filed by Christopher Williams, Jr. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2023 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding State Court Service Returned Executed. Action taken: Terminated answer deadline for Higginbotham Insurance Agency Inc. Party terminated in state court proceedings. (crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Trophy Trucking Services, LLC.(aty,Smith, Lea)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trophy Trucking Services, LLC. (aty,Smith, Lea)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings by Trophy Trucking Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Smith, Lea)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number C-202310858 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5777007) filed by Trophy Trucking Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party Trophy Trucking Services, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Smith, Lea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jr v. Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams, Jr
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Elliott Cade Cassidy
Represented By: Lenzi Cecilia Hebert
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry C Montgomery
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trophy Trucking Services L L C
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higginbotham Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Coast Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?