Aucoin v. Aymond et al
Plaintiff: David Aucoin
Defendant: Quentin Aymond, Caleb Aymond, John Roe, Jane Doe, Charles Guillory and Town of Mamou
Case Number: 6:2024cv00234
Filed: February 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, at counsel's request, the pending #6 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN by the movant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (crt,Chicola, C)
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 First MOTION to Dismiss penalty, Punitive or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 12, 2024 Motions Transferred regarding #11 First MOTION to Dismiss penalty, Punitive or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,LaCombe, L)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 First MOTION to Dismiss penalty, Punitive or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss penalty, Punitive or Exemplary Damages with incorporated memorandum by Caleb Aymond, Quentin Aymond, Jane Doe, Charles Guillory. (Attachments: #1 order)(aty,Vidrine, Jonathan) Modified to indicated memorandum filed within motion on 4/11/2024 (Thomas, T).
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages by Town of Mamou, David Aucoin. (aty,Rabalais, Joy) Modified on 4/5/2024 to add filer (Miletello, A).
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING #6 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages filed by Town of Mamou. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo.Issued by Judge David C Joseph on 3/26/2024. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 (WITHDRAWN) MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages by Town of Mamou. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rabalais, Joy) Modified to reflect withdrawn per #14 Order on 4/18/2024 (Chicola, C).
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Town of Mamou.(Attorney Joy C Rabalais added to party Town of Mamou(pty:dft))(aty,Rabalais, Joy)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Aucoin. Caleb Aymond, Charles Guillory, Quentin Aymond, Town of Mamou served on 2/23/24; answer due 3/15/24. (aty,Lewis, James) Modified on 3/20/2024 to indicate parties served, date of service and answer due dates.(Crick, S).
March 20, 2024 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James C Lewis on behalf of David Aucoin regarding #4 Summons Returned Executed,. Action taken: Terminated answer deadline for Jane Roe, John Doe as complaint cannot be served on unknown parties. (crt,Crick, S)
March 14, 2024 Filing 3 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Charles Guillory, Quentin Aymond, Caleb Aymond.(Attorney Jonathan C Vidrine added to party Charles Guillory(pty:dft))(aty,Vidrine, Jonathan) Modified to add filers on 3/14/2024. (Alexander, E)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caleb Aymond, Quentin Aymond, Jane Doe, Charles Guillory, Town of Mamou, John Roe. (crt,Crick, S)
February 19, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
February 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5859129) filed by David Aucoin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons to Defendant, #3 Summons to Defendant, #4 Summons to Defendant, #5 Summons to Defendant, #6 Summons to Defendant, #7 Summons to Defendant)(Attorney James C Lewis added to party David Aucoin(pty:pla))(aty,Lewis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aucoin v. Aymond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aucoin
Represented By: James C Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Aymond
Represented By: Jonathan C Vidrine
Represented By: Jonathan Stanford Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Aymond
Represented By: Jonathan C Vidrine
Represented By: Jonathan Stanford Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Guillory
Represented By: Jonathan C Vidrine
Represented By: Jonathan Stanford Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mamou
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Grant Ryan Schexnailder
Represented By: Hunter Beven Ahia
Represented By: Jordan John Henagan
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Heinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?