Thibodeaux v. D G Louisiana L L C et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Thibodeaux
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC, ABC Insurance Co, Dolgencorp LLC, D G Louisiana L L C, A B C Insurance Co and Dolgencorp L L C
Case Number: 6:2024cv00411
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 10 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kathleen Thibodeaux. (aty,Landgrave, Logan)
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 Response to Removal Order by D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C re #8 Removal Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete State Court Record)(aty,Ballero, Michael) Modified on 4/9/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C.(aty,Ballero, Michael)
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. (aty,Ballero, Michael)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dollar General Corp for DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. (aty,Ballero, Michael)
March 25, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Michael Louis Ballero, Logan Michael Landgrave on behalf of D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C, Kathleen Thibodeaux. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/8/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Michael Louis Ballero on behalf of D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/8/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 22, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20240378 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5893736) filed by DG Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Answers to RFAs)(Attorney Michael Louis Ballero added to party DG Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Ballero, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thibodeaux v. D G Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Thibodeaux
Represented By: Logan Michael Landgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D G Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp L L C
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?