Hebert v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Huey Hebert
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2024cv00499
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant Brief due by 7/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript)(aty,Brown, Shannon) Modified to indicate manual attachment received on 6/13/2024 (Williams, K).
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Clark on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Jonathan Clark added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Clark, Jonathan)
June 13, 2024 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Shannon Thornhill Brown on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security regarding #5 Answer to Complaint. Pursuant to LR 5.7.01, the electronic version of this manual attachment is considered the original. (crt,Williams, K)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Huey Hebert. (aty,Duhon, Gabe)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Chavis, J)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Huey Hebert against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5925951) filed by Huey Hebert.(Attorney Gabe Anthony Duhon added to party Huey Hebert(pty:pla))(aty,Duhon, Gabe)
April 25, 2024 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, upon U S Attorney, U S Attorney General and Kiolo Kiakazi requested by Huey Hebert. (aty,Duhon, Gabe)
April 25, 2024 SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
April 25, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chavis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huey Hebert
Represented By: Gabe Anthony Duhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jonathan Clark
Represented By: Shannon Thornhill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?