Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C v. Patroni et al
Plaintiff: Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C
Defendant: Dolphin Medical, LLC, Clyde L Patroni, William Darian chandler and Dolphin Medical L L C
Case Number: 6:2024cv00543
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2024 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively filed by Dolphin Medical L L C. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
June 19, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Darian Chandler, Clyde L Patroni. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
June 12, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Darcy Klug, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 - Text Messages)(aty,Montero, Marcia) Modified on 6/12/2024 (Thomas, T).
June 12, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively filed by Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Darcy Klug, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 - Text Messages)(aty,Montero, Marcia) Modified on 6/12/2024 (Thomas, T).
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Darian Chandler, Clyde L Patroni, #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively filed by Dolphin Medical L L C Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo.Issued by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/23/2024. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
May 22, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dolphin Medical, LLC, MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively by Dolphin Medical L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Patroni, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Chandler, #3 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by William Darian Chandler, Clyde L Patroni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal William Darian Chandler, Dolphin Medical L L C and Clyde L Patroni answer due 5/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 5/1/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by William Darian Chandler, Dolphin Medical L L C, Clyde L Patroni . (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by All Defendants. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.9 Certificate No Objection, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified docket text on 4/29/2024 (Miletello, A).
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/26/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 24, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 24, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Dolphin Medical, LLC answer due 5/1/2024; Clyde L Patroni answer due 5/1/2024; William Darian Chandler answer due 5/1/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attatchment #1 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dolphin Medical, LLC, Clyde L Patroni, William Darian chandler. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dolphin Medical, LLC. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20241572 Div. "C" (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5925114) filed by William Darian chandler, Clyde L Patroni, Dolphin Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Notice to Parties, #3 Exhibit C Notice to State Court, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party Dolphin Medical, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party Clyde L Patroni(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party William Darian chandler(pty:dft))(aty,Truxillo, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C v. Patroni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redhawk Medical Products & Services L L C
Represented By: Marcia Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Represented By: Keith John David Naccari
Represented By: Scott L Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Medical, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde L Patroni
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Darian chandler
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Medical L L C
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?