Tinian Women's Association et al v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Plaintiff: Tinian Women's Association, Guardians of Gani, PaganWatch and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense and Ashton Carter
Case Number: 1:2016cv00022
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V. Manglona
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED DECISION and ORDER on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment re 80 Motion for Summary Judgment 81 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/31/2018. (FPA)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECISION and ORDER on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment re Denying 80 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/22/2018. (BTC)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECISION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part in Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/13/2017. (FPA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinian Women's Association et al v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinian Women's Association
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Kimberlyn Kay King-Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardians of Gani
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Kimberlyn Kay King-Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PaganWatch
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Kimberlyn Kay King-Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Kimberlyn Kay King-Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mabus
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Carter
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?