Manila v. CNMI Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Reynaldo A Manila
Defendant: CNMI Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2018cv00003
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V. Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECISION re Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction and BRIEFING ORDER re CNMI'S Motion to Intervene and Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 5/10/2021. (LCG)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECISION AND ORDER on Defendant Guerrero and Defendant Cabrera's 36 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/10/2019. (DPB)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: (1) Granting 15 CNMI'S Motion to Correct Misjoinder and Motion to Dismiss; (2) Granting 13 Defendant Cabrera's Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 1/24/2019. (ADE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manila v. CNMI Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo A Manila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNMI Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?