Mangarero v. Sablan

Plaintiff: Venusto Mangarero
Defendant: Nick C. Sablan
Case Number: 1:2018cv00020
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by Venusto Mangarero. (BTC)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/16/2018. (FPA)
July 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to Nick C. Sablan. (FPA)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against Nick C. Sablan (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100005094.), filed by Venusto Mangarero. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangarero v. Sablan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venusto Mangarero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick C. Sablan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?